Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Apotex Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01333
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before December 21, 2020, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted or alternatively, submit a joint proposed scheduling order to the Court. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/21/2020.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01104-CFC, 1:20-cv-01333-CFC, 1:20-cv-01334-CFC(nmf)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings, Inc. for Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Francella, Thomas)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr on behalf of Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. (Francella, Thomas)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Francella, Thomas)
October 22, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Nicholas Groombridge, Eric Alan Stone, Josephine Young, Daniel J. Klein, Jennifer Rea Deneault for Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01104-CFC, 1:20-cv-01333-CFC, 1:20-cv-01334-CFC(kmd)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:20-cv-01334-CFC, 10 in 1:20-cv-01104-CFC, 9 in 1:20-cv-01333-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas Groombridge, Eric Alan Stone, Josephine Young, Daniel J. Klein and Jennifer Rae Deneault filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01104-CFC, 1:20-cv-01333-CFC, 1:20-cv-01334-CFC(nmf)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicholas Groombridge, Eric Alan Stone, Josephine Young, Daniel J. Klein and Jennifer Rae Deneault - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Apotex Inc. served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Fahnestock, Derek)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Apotex Corp. served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Fahnestock, Derek)
October 7, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Returns of Service have been deleted as the text contained the incorrect service date and so the system calculated an incorrect response deadline. They will be re-filed soon. (nmf)
October 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01333-CFC, 1:20-cv-01334-CFC (rjb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (amf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,610,510 and 10,610,511. (amf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: N/A. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ATTACHED FORM.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: N/A.(amf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3237737) - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Apotex Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jennifer Rea Deneault
Represented By: Josephine Young
Represented By: Eric Alan Stone
Represented By: Daniel J. Klein
Represented By: Nicholas Groombridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?