Dempster v. Adamczyk et al
Plaintiff: Donald Dempster, Sr.
Defendant: Jaime Chico Pardo, Gregory P. Lewis, Clive R. Hollick, Grace D. Lieblein, Robin L. Washington, Kevin Burke, Thomas A. Szlosek, David M. Cote, Linnet F. Deily, Darius E. Adamczyk, George Paz, Judd A. Gregg, William S. Ayer, Duncan B. Angove and D. Scott Davis
Nominal Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01340
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Related Action and Consolidation by Darius E. Adamczyk, Duncan B. Angove, William S. Ayer, Kevin Burke, David M. Cote, D. Scott Davis, Linnet F. Deily, Judd A. Gregg, Clive R. Hollick, Honeywell International Inc., Gregory P. Lewis, Grace D. Lieblein, Jaime Chico Pardo, George Paz, Thomas A. Szlosek, Robin L. Washington (Choa, Jonathan)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 15, 2020 filed by Gregory P. Lewis, Thomas A. Szlosek, Robin L. Washington, William S. Ayer, George Paz, Darius E. Adamczyk, Jaime Chico Pardo, Grace D. Lieblein, Kevin Burke, Honeywell International Inc., Clive R. Hollick, Linnet F. Deily, David M. Cote, Judd A. Gregg, D. Scott Davis, Duncan B. Angove, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: All Defendants answer due: 12/15/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/21/2020. (fms)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 15, 2020 - filed by Darius E. Adamczyk, Duncan B. Angove, William S. Ayer, Kevin Burke, David M. Cote, D. Scott Davis, Linnet F. Deily, Judd A. Gregg, Clive R. Hollick, Honeywell International Inc., Gregory P. Lewis, Grace D. Lieblein, Jaime Chico Pardo, George Paz, Thomas A. Szlosek, Robin L. Washington. (Choa, Jonathan)
October 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Thomas A. Szlosek served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Gregory P. Lewis served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. David M. Cote served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Robin L. Washington served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. George Paz served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Jaime Chico Pardo served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Grace D. Lieblein served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Clive R. Hollick served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Judd A. Gregg served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Linnet F. Deily served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. D. Scott Davis served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Kevin Burke served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. William S. Ayer served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Duncan B. Angove served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Darius E. Adamczyk served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Dempster, Sr. Honeywell International Inc. served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bennett, Blake)
October 5, 2020 Remark: Civil Cover Sheet replaced per counsels request. (apk)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Darius E. Adamczyk, Duncan B. Angove, William S. Ayer, Kevin Burke, David M. Cote, D. Scott Davis, Linnet F. Deily, Judd A. Gregg, Clive R. Hollick, Honeywell International Inc., Gregory P. Lewis, Grace D. Lieblein, Jaime Chico Pardo, George Paz, Thomas A. Szlosek, Robin L. Washington - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3240840.) - filed by Donald Dempster, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/5/2020) (apk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dempster v. Adamczyk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Chico Pardo
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P. Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clive R. Hollick
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace D. Lieblein
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin L. Washington
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Burke
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Szlosek
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Cote
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnet F. Deily
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darius E. Adamczyk
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Paz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judd A. Gregg
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S. Ayer
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan B. Angove
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Davis
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dempster, Sr.
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?