Stuhler et al v. ViacomCBS Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia Stuhler and Richard Stuhler
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., CBS Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Viacom Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Crane Co., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corp., Johnson Controls Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, Grinnell Corporation, AlliedSignal, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., The Bendix Corporation, ITT Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., BW/IP Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01357
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 34 Amended Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding Service of the Complaint, Defendants' Answers, and R.16 Conference. (Hrubiec, R.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint served on Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. on 11/11/2020, filed by Cecilia Stuhler, Richard Stuhler. (Hrubiec, R.)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 1/6/2021 at 1:00 p.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 12/30/2020. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/13/2020. (lih)
November 11, 2020 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by FMC Corporation. (Glenn, Neal)
November 11, 2020 Filing 31 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding Service of the Complaint, Defendants' Answers, and R.16 Conference. (Hrubiec, R.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Adams, William)
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against all defendants against Armstrong International, Inc. by Armstrong International, Inc..(Adams, William) Modified on 11/4/2020 (lih).
November 4, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Adams on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Adams, William)
November 4, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #29 has been modified to reflect that the document is an ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM. Counsel is advised to use the correct event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
November 2, 2020 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
November 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
October 30, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
October 30, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Costello, Kelly)
October 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/28/2020. (lih)
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BW/IP Inc.. (Doner, Joel)
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation. (Glenn, Neal)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Donelson, Matthew)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 10/23/2020 (lih).
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of FMC Corporation (Glenn, Neal)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED re #4 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/14/2020. (dlw)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying filed by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Crane Co. (Skiles, Nicholas)
October 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
October 14, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 4 has been replaced on the docket with a version that contains signatures and the correct caption. (dlw)
October 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International, Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Texter, Allison) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/14/2020) (dlw).
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc. - filed by ViacomCBS Inc. (kmd)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number N20C-07-244 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3250197)- filed by ViacomCBS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuhler et al v. ViacomCBS Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Stuhler
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stuhler
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?