Morales et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Callier, Nathan Byars, Ben Fabrikant, Kurt Morales, II and Stephen Ost
Defendant: Sunpath Ltd., Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc. and Matrix Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01376
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for Nathan Byars, Brandon Callier, Ben Fabrikant, Kurt Morales, II and Stephen Ost added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
October 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark L. Javitch for Nathan Byars, Brandon Callier, Ben Fabrikant, Kurt Morales, II, and Stephen Ost added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kurt Morales, II, Ben Fabrikant, Brandon Callier, Nathan Byars, Stephen Ost. Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc. served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Bifferato, Ian)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Javitch, filed by Nathan Byars, Kurt Morales, II, Brandon Callier, Ben Fabrikant, Stephen Ost, and #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr., filed by Nathan Byars, Kurt Morales, II, Brandon Callier, Ben Fabrikant, Stephen Ost. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/15/2020. (nms)
October 15, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: The summons returned executed at D.I. 4 has been removed from the docket as the incorrect service date was entered. Counsel is to refile the executed summons for Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc. using the correct date (10/14/2020). (nms)
October 15, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: (nms)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. - filed by Nathan Byars, Brandon Callier, Ben Fabrikant, Kurt Morales, II, Stephen Ost. (Bifferato, Ian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Javitch - filed by Nathan Byars, Brandon Callier, Ben Fabrikant, Kurt Morales, II, Stephen Ost. (Bifferato, Ian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kurt Morales, II, Ben Fabrikant, Brandon Callier, Nathan Byars, Stephen Ost. Matrix Financial Services, LLC served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Bifferato, Ian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kurt Morales, II, Ben Fabrikant, Brandon Callier, Nathan Byars, Stephen Ost. Sunpath Ltd. served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Bifferato, Ian)
October 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Matrix Financial Services, LLC, Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc., Sunpath Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3256562.) - filed by Kurt Morales, II, Ben Fabrikant, Brandon Callier, Nathan Byars, Stephen Ost. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Callier
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Byars
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Fabrikant
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Morales, II
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Ost
Represented By: Ian Connor Bifferato
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunpath Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northcoast Warranty Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?