Philpot v. Arkadium, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Arkadium, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01427
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/18/2020. (dlw)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Arkadium, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Arkadium, Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant, Arkadium, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 18, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Arkadium, Inc. answer due 12/18/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/16/2020. (dlw)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant, Arkadium, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 18, 2020 - filed by Arkadium, Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Larry G. Philpot. Arkadium, Inc. served on 10/28/2020, answer due 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Process on Arkadium, Inc.)(Warner, Raeann)
October 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Larry G. Philpot. (kmd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s) VAu 1-164-648. (Report mailed to Copyright Office) (kmd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Arkadium, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $400, receipt number ADEDC-3287627.) - filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) Modified on 10/26/2020 (kmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Arkadium, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkadium, Inc.
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?