Philpot v. RFD-TV, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: RFD-TV, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01459
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by January 14, 2021 filed by Larry G. Philpot. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: RFD-TV, LLC answer due 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/15/2020. (fms)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by January 14, 2022 - filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Warner, Raeann)
November 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Larry G. Philpot. RFD-TV, LLC served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Process on RFD-TV, LLC)(Warner, Raeann)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Larry G. Philpot. (mal)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)VAu 1-132-411; A copy of the report was mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (mal)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against RFD-TV, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3296289.) - filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. RFD-TV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RFD-TV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?