Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R v. Astrazeneca LP et al
Plaintiff: Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P. and Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01470
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION AND COORDINATION OF CERTAIN CASES, CONSOLIDATION OF DOCKETS AND BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' OPERATIVE COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
December 14, 2020 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:20-cv-01076-CFC. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-1076-CFC ONLY. (nmf)
December 4, 2020 Filing 35 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from J. Clayton Athey, Esq. regarding Coordination and Consolidation of pending cases. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit B3, #6 Exhibit B4)(Athey, J.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Barry on behalf of Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund (Barry, Michael)
November 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher,Akhil K. Gola for AstraZeneca LP AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. and AstraZeneca UK Limited. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01470-CFC et al.(mal)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (33 in 1:20-cv-01470-CFC, 38 in 1:20-cv-01469-CFC, 76 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 43 in 1:20-cv-01471-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01473-CFC, 90 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 33 in 1:20-cv-01472-CFC, 155 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01474-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01468-CFC, 127 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., AstraZeneca,LP. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
November 12, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola - filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca,LP, Astrazeneca L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola)(Silver, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (42 in 1:20-cv-01471-CFC, 31 in 1:20-cv-01473-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01469-CFC, 36 in 1:20-cv-01474-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01472-CFC, 36 in 1:20-cv-01468-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01470-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01468-CFC et al.(fms)
November 6, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 6, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Joyce, Alexandra)
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Kelly, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Silver, Daniel)
November 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01468-CFC through 1:20-cv-01474-CFC (rjb)
November 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Related Cases by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Silver, Daniel)
October 29, 2020 Filing 26 Local Counsel Letter sent to Frank Rocco Schirripa. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/30/2020. (mal)
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-09036. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 12, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER granting (107) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM. Defendants' motion to transfer this action to the District of Delaware is GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a "written opinion." The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. No. 107 and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The motion of Donna M. Evans for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (25) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08712-CM; granting (26) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08856-CM; granting (21) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09036-CM; granting (31) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM; granting (22) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09094-CM; granting (26) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09171-CM; granting (21) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09271-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
January 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-18141885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-18141885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(Evans, Donna) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (23) Motion for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Justin N. Boley is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (19) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08712-CM; granting (20) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08856-CM; granting (15) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09036-CM; granting (17) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM; granting (16) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09094-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (21) Motion for Tyler J. Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Tyler J. Story is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17783729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (96) Motion for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (22) Motion for Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kenneth A. Wexler is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties in the above-captioned matters are hereby instructed to appear for a conference on Friday, November 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/17/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17783729. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(Khan, Sabira) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 3, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION ALLOWING FOR CONSOLIDATION AND ENTRY OF AN INTERIM SCHEDULE: 1. All actions related to the End-Payor Class Actions filed in or transferred to this district, or to be filed or transferred, shall bear the following caption: In re: Seroquel XR (Extended Release Quetiapine Fumarate) Litigation All End-Payor Class Actions. 2. Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc., et al v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., et al., 1:19-cv-08296-CM shall be designated the Lead End-Payor Class Action. A lead End-Payor Class Action file will be established for the End-Payor Class Actions and a docket sheet shall be maintained for that file which shall include all filings subsequently coordinated with the lead End-Payor Class Action, as further set forth in this Order. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. Responses due by 11/27/2019. Replies due by 12/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Robertson, Sharon) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-8712. Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Schirripa, Frank) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca UK Limited. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca LP. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Schirripa, Frank) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca UK Limited, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Schirripa, Frank) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Schirripa, Frank) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca LP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Schirripa, Frank) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Frank Rocco Schirripa to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; each request must be its own separate docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frank Rocco Schirripa. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Frank Rocco Schirripa, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frank Rocco Schirripa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP; AstraZeneca LP; AstraZeneca UK Limited; Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R. (Schirripa, Frank) Modified on 9/30/2019 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schirripa, Frank) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17680235)Document filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R.(Schirripa, Frank) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R v. Astrazeneca LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca L.P.
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?