The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund v. AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund and Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association
Defendant: Astrazeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01473
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION AND COORDINATION OF CERTAIN CASES, CONSOLIDATION OF DOCKETS AND BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' OPERATIVE COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(nmf)
December 14, 2020 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:20-cv-01076-CFC. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-1076-CFC ONLY. (nmf)
December 4, 2020 Filing 34 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from J. Clayton Athey, Esq. regarding Coordination and Consolidation of pending cases. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit B3, #6 Exhibit B4)(Athey, J.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Barry on behalf of Sergeants Benevolent Association Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C and 137R, Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund (Barry, Michael)
November 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher,Akhil K. Gola for AstraZeneca LP AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. and AstraZeneca UK Limited. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01470-CFC et al.(mal)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (33 in 1:20-cv-01470-CFC, 38 in 1:20-cv-01469-CFC, 76 in 1:20-cv-01087-CFC, 43 in 1:20-cv-01471-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01473-CFC, 90 in 1:20-cv-01086-CFC, 33 in 1:20-cv-01472-CFC, 155 in 1:20-cv-01090-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01089-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01474-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01468-CFC, 127 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Astrazeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., AstraZeneca,LP. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC et al.(fms)
November 12, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola - filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca L.P., Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, AstraZeneca L P, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L P, AstraZeneca,LP, Astrazeneca L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Thomas S. Fletcher & Akhil K. Gola)(Silver, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (42 in 1:20-cv-01471-CFC, 31 in 1:20-cv-01473-CFC, 37 in 1:20-cv-01469-CFC, 36 in 1:20-cv-01474-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01472-CFC, 36 in 1:20-cv-01468-CFC, 32 in 1:20-cv-01470-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01468-CFC et al.(fms)
November 6, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen J. McIntyre, Brett J. Williamson and Ben Bradshaw of O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP - filed by Par Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Joyce, Alexandra)
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kelly on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Kelly, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Silver, Daniel)
November 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01468-CFC through 1:20-cv-01474-CFC (rjb)
November 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Related Cases by AstraZeneca L.P., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca,LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaecuticals LP, Astrazeneca L.P. (Silver, Daniel)
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/30/2020. (amf)
October 29, 2020 Filing 24 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:19-cv-09271. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
August 12, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Delaware. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER granting (107) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM. Defendants' motion to transfer this action to the District of Delaware is GRANTED. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. It is a "written opinion." The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. No. 107 and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (25) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08712-CM; granting (26) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08856-CM; granting (21) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09036-CM; granting (31) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM; granting (22) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09094-CM; granting (26) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09171-CM; granting (21) Motion for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09271-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
January 7, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-18141885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Donna M. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-18141885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al.(Evans, Donna) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (23) Motion for Justin N. Boley to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Justin N. Boley is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (19) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08712-CM; granting (20) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-08856-CM; granting (15) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09036-CM; granting (17) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM; granting (16) Motion for Sabira Fatima Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09094-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE in case 1:19-cv-08296-CM; granting (21) Motion for Tyler J. Story to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09083-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Tyler J. Story is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-08296-CM et al. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:19-cv-08296-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/08/2019) (NAP) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties in the above-captioned matters are hereby instructed to appear for a conference on Friday, November 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/17/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca UK Limited. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astrazeneca L.P.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian D Brooks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund. (Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund. (Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Astrazeneca UK Limited, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund. (Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Astrazeneca L.P., re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund. (Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association, The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund. (Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P., Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund, The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association.(Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian D Brooks. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian D Brooks to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption contains a typographical error on PDF; the name/names of the party/parties for whom the summons is being requested must all be entered in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brian D Brooks to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brian D Brooks to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; The Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association must be added to the case; the All Defendant radio button was selected; all filers were not added/selected for the pleading; the party/parties whom the pleading is against were not selected; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney (Brian D Brooks). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund.(Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-08296 (CM). Document filed by The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund.(Brooks, Brian) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Brian D Brooks, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendants, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund. (Brooks, Brian) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17730272)Document filed by The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Brian) Modified on 10/8/2019 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund v. AstraZeneca PHarmaceuticals L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniformed Firefighters' Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retired Firefighters' Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters' Association
Represented By: Michael J. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca L.P.
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Akhil K. Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?