Mossinger v. State of Delaware Division of Child Support Services
Plaintiff: Ruth Mossinger
Defendant: State of Delaware Division of Child Support Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv01526
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Remark: $400 Filing Fee Paid; Receipt # DEX034885. (kmd)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee within thirty days from the date this order is sent, or the case shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/11/2020. (kmd)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Ruth Mossinger. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(myr)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Plaintiff shall submit IFP long form application or pay in full the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to submit items within 21 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 12/10/2020. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/19/2020. (myr)
November 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against State of Delaware Division of Child Support Services(NO IFP, NO FEE PAID) - filed by Ruth Mossinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mossinger v. State of Delaware Division of Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Mossinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Delaware Division of Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?