Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. et al v. Hetero Labs Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. and H. Lundbeck A/S
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd., Honour Lab Ltd., Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V and Hetero USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01531
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Kenneth S. Canfield and Dmitry V. Shelhoff for Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA, Inc., Honour Lab Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (14 in 1:20-cv-01531-LPS, 10 in 1:20-cv-01599-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield, Attorney Edward D. Pergament, and Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff filed by Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd., Zenara Pharma Private Ltd., Hetero USA, Inc., Honour Lab Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero Drugs Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/5/21. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01531-LPS, 1:20-cv-01599-LPS (ntl)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (14 in 1:20-cv-01365-LPS, 8 in 1:20-cv-01287-LPS, 13 in 1:20-cv-01296-LPS, 9 in 1:20-cv-01599-LPS, 7 in 1:20-cv-01428-LPS, 12 in 1:20-cv-01423-LPS, 11 in 1:20-cv-01335-LPS, 10 in 1:20-cv-01295-LPS, 7 in 1:20-cv-01581-LPS, 7 in 1:20-cv-01502-LPS, 7 in 1:20-cv-01763-LPS, 10 in 1:20-cv-01297-LPS, 11 in 1:20-cv-01332-LPS, 13 in 1:20-cv-01531-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Denise Main, Erin M. Sommers, C. Collette Corser and Tyler B. Latcham filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co.,Ltd, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/5/21. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01287-LPS et al. (ntl)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield, Attorney Edward D. Pergament, and Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff - filed by Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd., Zenara Pharma Private Ltd., Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA, Inc., Honour Lab Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Denise Main, Erin M. Sommers, C. Collette Corser and Tyler B. Latcham - filed by H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co.,Ltd, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., H. Lundbeck A/S. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Honour Lab Ltd. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by H. Lundbeck A/S, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/10/2020. (Balick, Steven)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Honour Lab Ltd.. (Hitch, Cortlan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hetero Labs Ltd., Corporate Parent Hetero Drugs Ltd. for Hetero USA, Inc. filed by Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA, Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hetero Drugs Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA, Inc., Honour Lab Ltd..(Hitch, Cortlan)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Honour Lab Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 13, 2020 No Summons Issued. (myr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by H. Lundbeck. (myr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd. for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd.. (myr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US RE48,059. (myr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: October 2, 2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: April 12, 2026; pending Patent Term Extension request, when granted, extends to December 23, 2028.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/10/2023. (myr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero USA, Inc., Honour Lab Ltd.,Hetero Drugs Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3331208.) - filed by Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd., H. Lundbeck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. et al v. Hetero Labs Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honour Lab Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Lundbeck A/S
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?