Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd. and Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.
Defendant: Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Cadila Healthcare Ltd. doing business as Zydus Cadila, Apotex Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Windlas Biotech Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis LLC, Lupin Ltd., Huahai US Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc., Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., Sawai USA, Inc., Apotex Corp., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Aurolife Pharma LLC, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Sandoz Inc. and Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01589
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance A. Soderstrom, Joseph M. Janusz and Joseph M. Janusz - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Deepro R. Mukerjee, #2 Certification of Lance A. Soderstrom, #3 Certification of Joseph M. Janusz, #4 Certification of Jillian M. Schurr, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaman, John)
January 22, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance of John M. Seaman and Christopher F. Cannataro of Abrams & Bayliss LLP by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. (Seaman, John)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Deanne M. Mazzochi, Rachel Pernic Waldron and Kevin P. Burke of Rakoczy Molino Mazzochi Siwik LLP filed by Sandoz Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/22/2021. (dlb)
January 22, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Deanne M. Mazzochi, Rachel Pernic Waldron and Kevin P. Burke of Rakoczy Molino Mazzochi Siwik LLP - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
January 22, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brent A. Batzer for Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #40 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for Sandoz to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to March 16, 2021 filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/21/2021. (dlb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for Sandoz to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to March 16, 2021 - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
January 20, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chika Seidel for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. and Astellas Pharma Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 15, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shashank D. Upadhye for Huahai US Inc., for Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.,for Solco Healthcare US, LLC, for Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
January 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nitya Anand for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. and Astellas Pharma Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yixin H. Tang for Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dennies Varughese, Sasha S. Rao for Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., and Aurolife Pharma LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
January 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Vincent Li for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. and Astellas Pharma Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Simon D. Roberts for Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. and Astellas Pharma Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
January 7, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney George C. Lombardi for Actavis Elizabeth LLC, for Actavis LLC, for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
January 7, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samantha M. Lerner for Actavis Elizabeth LLC,for Actavis LLC, for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., D.I. #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samantha M. Lerner filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., D.I. #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon D. Roberts, Jason A. Leonard, Nitya Anand, Chika S. Seidel, Vincent Li, and Celine Jimenez Crowson of Hogan Lovells US LLP filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.,and D.I. #36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sasha Rao and Attorney Dennies Varughese filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma LLC, Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/7/2020. (dlb)
January 7, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
December 28, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samantha M. Lerner - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
December 23, 2020 Filing 37 PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Silver, Daniel)
December 23, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sasha Rao and Attorney Dennies Varughese - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 22, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Laurence Dorsney on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma LLC (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 22, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Service for Defendant Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
December 22, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Service for Defendant Huahai US Inc. by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #30 Stipulation filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc. Answer Deadlines: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. answer due 3/16/2021.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/21/2020. (dlb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Ann Swadley on behalf of Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. (Swadley, Beth)
December 21, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Pilar Gabrielle Kraman on behalf of Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. (Kraman, Pilar)
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Governing Acceptance of Service of Process and Response Time to Complaint by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shashank Upadhye, Yixin Tang, Brent Batzer, and Lindsay Eastman filed by Huahai US Inc., Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/18/2020. (dlb)
December 16, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shashank Upadhye, Yixin Tang, Brent Batzer, and Lindsay Eastman - filed by Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 16, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 15, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Aurolife Pharma LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 15, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Sodikoff and Matthew M. Holub of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/14/2020. (dlb)
December 11, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Sodikoff and Matthew M. Holub of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP - filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA, Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
December 10, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Service of Windlas Biotech Ltd. made on December 8, 2020 by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
December 10, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Service of Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd. made on December 8, 2020 by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.. Solco Healthcare US, LLC served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 9, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Silver, Daniel)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Sawai USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 8, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 12/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 7, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Apotex Corp. waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Apotex Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Sandoz Inc. waiver sent on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Lupin Ltd. waiver sent on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Cadila Healthcare Ltd. waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Actavis LLC waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.: For Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Simon D. Roberts, Jason A. Leonard, Nitya Anand, Chika S. Seidel, Vincent Li, and Celine Jimenez Crowson of Hogan Lovells US LLP - filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Simon D. Roberts, #2 Certification of Jason A. Leonard, #3 Certification of Nitya Arnand, #4 Certification of Chika S. Seidel, #5 Certification of Vincent Li, #6 Certification of Celine Jiminez Crowson)(Silver, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER Pursuant to the filing of this case, the Court issues the following order: Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke shall issue a scheduling order when appropriate. Magistrate Judge Burke shall handle all nondispositive matters on all issues, except for Daubert motions, Markman hearings, and pretrial motions in limine. The parties have the right to file an appeal of the magistrate judge's order, and the same shall be decided by the undersigned. The magistrate judge shall likewise handle all discovery matters, scheduling, and pretrial conferences. If the parties believe the magistrate judge has a conflict of interest with this case, the parties shall so notify the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 11/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01589-JFB et al.(AEV)
November 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska (due to prior related cases). Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 24, 2020 No Summons Issued. (apk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd., Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc.. (apk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,842,780. (apk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: SEE ATTACHED. Date of Expiration of Patent: 09/28/2029. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: Not Applicable. (apk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis LLC., Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurolife Pharma LLC., Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Huahai US Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sawai Pharmaceutical CO.,Ltd, Sawai USA, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Windlas Biotech Ltd., Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical CO.,Ltd, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3351962.) - filed by Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc., Astellas Pharma Inc., Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Astellas Pharma Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadila Healthcare Ltd. doing business as Zydus Cadila
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Samantha M. Lerner
Represented By: George C. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windlas Biotech Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Samantha M. Lerner
Represented By: George C. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Samantha M. Lerner
Represented By: George C. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huahai US Inc.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Brent A. Batzer
Represented By: Shashank D. Upadhye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Beth Ann Swadley
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawai USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solco Healthcare US, LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Brent A. Batzer
Represented By: Shashank D. Upadhye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurolife Pharma LLC
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Yixin H. Tang
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Brent A. Batzer
Represented By: Shashank D. Upadhye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Brent A. Batzer
Represented By: Shashank D. Upadhye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astellas Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Chika Seidel
Represented By: Vincent Li
Represented By: Nitya Anand
Represented By: Simon D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astellas Ireland Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Chika Seidel
Represented By: Vincent Li
Represented By: Nitya Anand
Represented By: Simon D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astellas Pharma Global Development, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Chika Seidel
Represented By: Vincent Li
Represented By: Nitya Anand
Represented By: Simon D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?