Hollett v. Gilmore et al
Plaintiff: Norman Hollett
Defendant: Martha B. Wyrsch, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Parker S. Kennedy, Thomas V. McKernan, James L. Doti, Mark C. Oman and Mark E. Seaton
Nominal Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01620
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 REMARK: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:21-cv-00525, filed 01/20/2021. (sam) Modified on 1/20/2021 (nms).
January 20, 2021 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. (nms)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SO ORDERED Granting #8 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Transfer of Action. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2021. (nms)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Transfer of Action by James L. Doti, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. (DiCamillo, Raymond)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Response to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadline: Defendants' answers due by 2/19/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2020. (nms)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Defendant Response to Complaint by James L. Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. (O'Toole, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond J. DiCamillo on behalf of James L. Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch (DiCamillo, Raymond)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. O'Toole on behalf of James L. Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch (O'Toole, John)
December 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman Hollett. First American Financial Corporation served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Farnan, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against James L. Doti, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, and Martha B. Wyrsch - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3356660.) - filed by Norman Hollett. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollett v. Gilmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha B. Wyrsch
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis J. Gilmore
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald H. Gilyard
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret M. McCarthy
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. McKee
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker S. Kennedy
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas V. McKernan
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Doti
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C. Oman
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Seaton
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Hollett
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?