Reed et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Craig Morford, Stacey Coppock, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed and David Schiavi
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01631
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in Eastern District of California - Live System as case 2:21-cv-00417, filed 03/09/2021. (amf)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/9/21. (ntl)
March 9, 2021 Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of California. (ntl)
March 8, 2021 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Venue by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond filed by Craig Morford, David Schiavi, Stacey Coppock, Robert Reed, Kelli Morford. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/21. (ntl)
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond by Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed, David Schiavi. (Paul, Russell)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ford Motor Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Singewald, Christian)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singewald, Christian)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of by Ford Motor Company Request for Inspection to Plaintiffs Craig and Kelli Morford (Singewald, Christian)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randall W. Edwards, Scott Hammack, Damali Taylor, Amy J. Laurendeau, and, Sherry Rozell - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Randall W. Edwards, Scott Hammack, Damali Taylor, Amy J. Laurendeau, and, Sherry Rozell filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/17/20. (ntl)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ford Motor Company: For Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Singewald, Christian)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven R Weinmann filed by Craig Morford, David Schiavi, Stacey Coppock, Robert Reed, Kelli Morford, #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy filed by Craig Morford, David Schiavi, Stacey Coppock, Robert Reed, Kelli Morford, #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cody R. Padgett filed by Craig Morford, David Schiavi, Stacey Coppock, Robert Reed, Kelli Morford, #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Abigail J. Gertner filed by Craig Morford, David Schiavi, Stacey Coppock, Robert Reed, Kelli Morford, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amey J. Park filed by Craig Morford, David Schiavi, Stacey Coppock, Robert Reed, Kelli Morford. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/3/20. (ntl)
December 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Amey J. Park and Abigail J. Gertner for Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed, David Schiavi added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
December 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy,Cody R. Padgett,Steven R. Weinmann for Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed and David Schiavi added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven R Weinmann - filed by Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed, David Schiavi. (Paul, Russell)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy - filed by Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed, David Schiavi. (Paul, Russell)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cody R. Padgett - filed by Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed, David Schiavi. (Paul, Russell)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Abigail J. Gertner - filed by Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed, David Schiavi. (Paul, Russell)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amey J. Park - filed by Stacey Coppock, Craig Morford, Kelli Morford, Robert Reed, David Schiavi. (Paul, Russell)
December 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3364585.) - filed by Robert Reed, Stacey Coppock, Kelli Morford, David Schiavi, Craig Morford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Morford
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Coppock
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Morford
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reed
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schiavi
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Represented By: Amey J. Park
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Abigail J. Gertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?