Nyiradi, et al. v. Michas, et al.
Plaintiff: Peter Wahler and Maria Nyiradi
Defendant: Timothy M. Manganello, Richard O. Schaum, David T. Brown, Roger A. Krone, John J. Gasparovic, Thomas T. Stallkamp, Robin J. Adams, Dennis C. Cuneo, James R. Verrier, Ronald T. Hundzinski, John R. McKernan, Jr., Phyllis O. Bonanno, Vicki L. Sato, Alexis P. Michas, Jere A. Drummond, Michael S. Hanley, Jan Carlson and Ernest J. Novak, Jr.
Nominal Defendant: BorgWarner Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01700
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janet A. Gochman, filed by Robin J. Adams, Jan Carlson, James R. Verrier, Roger A. Krone, Vicki L. Sato, Phyllis O. Bonanno, Thomas T. Stallkamp, Ernest J. Novak, Jr., David T. Brown, Michael S. Hanley, BorgWarner Inc., Richard O. Schaum, Ronald T. Hundzinski, Dennis C. Cuneo, Jere A. Drummond, John J. Gasparovic, John R. McKernan, Jr., Alexis P. Michas, Timothy M. Manganello. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/8/2021. (nms)
February 8, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janet A. Gochman - filed by Robin J. Adams, Phyllis O. Bonanno, BorgWarner Inc., David T. Brown, Jan Carlson, Dennis C. Cuneo, Jere A. Drummond, John J. Gasparovic, Michael S. Hanley, Ronald T. Hundzinski, Roger A. Krone, Timothy M. Manganello, John R. McKernan, Jr, Alexis P. Michas, Ernest J. Novak, Jr, Vicki L. Sato, Richard O. Schaum, Thomas T. Stallkamp, James R. Verrier. (Vrana, Robert)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan K. Youngwood, filed by Robin J. Adams, Jan Carlson, James R. Verrier, Roger A. Krone, Vicki L. Sato, Phyllis O. Bonanno, Thomas T. Stallkamp, Ernest J. Novak, Jr., David T. Brown, Michael S. Hanley, BorgWarner Inc., Richard O. Schaum, Ronald T. Hundzinski, Dennis C. Cuneo, Jere A. Drummond, John J. Gasparovic, John R. McKernan, Jr., Alexis P. Michas, Timothy M. Manganello. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2021. (nms)
January 12, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan K. Youngwood - filed by Robin J. Adams, Phyllis O. Bonanno, BorgWarner Inc., David T. Brown, Jan Carlson, Dennis C. Cuneo, Jere A. Drummond, John J. Gasparovic, Michael S. Hanley, Ronald T. Hundzinski, Roger A. Krone, Timothy M. Manganello, John R. McKernan, Jr, Alexis P. Michas, Ernest J. Novak, Jr, Vicki L. Sato, Richard O. Schaum, Thomas T. Stallkamp, James R. Verrier. (Vrana, Robert)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Robin J. Adams answer due 3/1/2021; Phyllis O. Bonanno answer due 3/1/2021; BorgWarner Inc. answer due 3/1/2021; David T. Brown answer due 3/1/2021; Jan Carlson answer due 3/1/2021; Dennis C. Cuneo answer due 3/1/2021; Jere A. Drummond answer due 3/1/2021; John J. Gasparovic answer due 3/1/2021; Michael S. Hanley answer due 3/1/2021; Ronald T. Hundzinski answer due 3/1/2021; Roger A. Krone answer due 3/1/2021; Timothy M. Manganello answer due 3/1/2021; John R. McKernan, Jr answer due 3/1/2021; Alexis P. Michas answer due 3/1/2021; Ernest J. Novak, Jr answer due 3/1/2021; Vicki L. Sato answer due 3/1/2021; Richard O. Schaum answer due 3/1/2021; Thomas T. Stallkamp answer due 3/1/2021; James R. Verrier answer due 3/1/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2021. (nms)
January 11, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to March 1, 2021 - filed by Robin J. Adams, Phyllis O. Bonanno, David T. Brown, Jan Carlson, Dennis C. Cuneo, Jere A. Drummond, John J. Gasparovic, Michael S. Hanley, Ronald T. Hundzinski, Roger A. Krone, Timothy M. Manganello, John R. McKernan, Jr, Alexis P. Michas, Ernest J. Novak, Jr, Vicki L. Sato, Richard O. Schaum, Thomas T. Stallkamp, James R. Verrier. (Vrana, Robert)
January 8, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Timothy M. Manganello served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Robin J. Adams served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Thomas T. Stallkamp served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Jan Carlson served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Richard O. Schaum served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Roger A. Krone served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Vicki L. Sato served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Michael S. Hanley served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. James R. Verrier served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. John J. Gasparovic served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. David T. Brown served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Ronald T. Hundzinski served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Phyllis O. Bonanno served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Jere A. Drummond served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Ernest J. Novak, Jr served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Dennis C. Cuneo served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. John R. McKernan, Jr served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. Alexis P. Michas served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. BorgWarner Inc. served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bennett, Blake)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Maria Nyiradi, Peter Wahler. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 12/29/2020 (nms).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER: The request for an extension to file the redacted version of the Complaint (D.I. #6 ) is GRANTED. The redacted filing is due by 12/27/2020. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/22/2020. (nms)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Blake A. Bennett, Counsel for Plaintiffs regarding Public Version of Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Bennett, Blake)
December 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 15, 2020 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (sam)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/15/2020. (nms)
December 15, 2020 Remark: Exit to Duty Judge RGA (sam)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 [SEALED] VERIFIED Complaint for Violation of Securities Law and Breach of Fiduciary Duty against Robin J. Adams, Phyllis O. Bonanno, BorgWarner Inc., David T. Brown, Jan Carlson, Dennis C. Cuneo, Jere A. Drummond, John J. Gasparovic, Michael S. Hanley, Ronald T. Hundzinski, Roger A. Krone, Timothy M. Manganello, John R. McKernan, Jr, Alexis P. Michas, Ernest J. Novak, Jr, Vicki L. Sato, Richard O. Schaum, Thomas T. Stallkamp, James R. Verrier (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3397548) - filed by Peter Wahler, Maria Nyiradi. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Plaintiff - Nyiradi, #2 Verification of Plaintiff - Wahler, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) Modified on 12/15/2020 (nms).
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Maria Nyiradi, Peter Wahler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sam) Modified on 12/15/2020 (nms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyiradi, et al. v. Michas, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Wahler
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Nyiradi
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Manganello
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard O. Schaum
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Brown
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger A. Krone
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Gasparovic
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas T. Stallkamp
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin J. Adams
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis C. Cuneo
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Verrier
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald T. Hundzinski
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. McKernan, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis O. Bonanno
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki L. Sato
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis P. Michas
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jere A. Drummond
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Hanley
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Carlson
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest J. Novak, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: BorgWarner Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Vrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?