Trabilcy v. Gold et al
Plaintiff: William Trabilcy
Defendant: William D. Rueckert, Daniel P. Gold, Thomas C. Reynolds, Christine A. White, Charles V. Baltic, III, Tamar D. Howson, Frederick W. Driscoll, Robert Mass, Kevan E. Clemens, Brian G. Drazba and Nicholas R. Glover
Nominal Defendant: MEI Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01702
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 ALL FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-1414-CFC. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01414-CFC, 1:20-cv-01639-CFC, 1:20-cv-01702-CFC(fms)
December 29, 2020 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:20-cv-01414-CFC. (fms)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:20-cv-01639-CFC, 10 in 1:20-cv-01414-CFC, 3 in 1:20-cv-01702-CFC) Stipulation filed by Peter D'Arcy. All papers filed in connection with the Consolidated Action will be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 1:20-cv-01414-CFC; See Stipulation for further details and deadlines. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01414-CFC, 1:20-cv-01639-CFC, 1:20-cv-01702-CFC(fms)
December 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 23, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: deleted assignment of case to incorrect Judge. (rjb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions by Peter D'Arcy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael)
December 15, 2020 No Summons Issued. (apk)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Charles V. Baltic, III, Kevan E. Clemens, Brian G. Drazba, Frederick W. Driscoll, Nicholas R. Glover, Daniel P. Gold, Tamar D. Howson, Robert Mass, Thomas C. Reynolds, William D. Rueckert, Christine A. White - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3398389.) - filed by William Trabilcy. (Attachments: #1 Verification of William Trabilcy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trabilcy v. Gold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Trabilcy
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Rueckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles V. Baltic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamar D. Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick W. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevan E. Clemens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian G. Drazba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas R. Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: MEI Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?