Cephas v. Oliver et al
Plaintiff: Tyneka Cephas
Defendant: Robert J. Tracy, Thomas Oliver, Jr. and City Of Wilmington
Case Number: 1:2020cv01712
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Stephanos Bibas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emeka Igwe for Tyneka Cephas added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge D. Brooks Smith, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 2/10/2021. (rjb)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (SB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emeka Igwe filed by Tyneka Cephas. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/29/2021. (fms)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Answering Brief and Response Deadline, and Defendants' Reply Brief and Reply Deadline to February 26, 2021 and March 12, 2021, Respectively - filed by Thomas Oliver, Jr. (Herr, Daniel)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to counsel re #9 Stipulation to EXTEND Time. The stipulation lacks electronic signature of counsel for plaintiff and defendants Robert J. Tracy and City of Wilmington. Counsel should refile the stipulation with electronic signatures of all local counsel. (fms)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Answering Brief and Response Deadline, and Defendants' Reply Brief and Reply Deadline to February 26, 2021 and March 12, 2021, Respectively filed by Thomas Oliver, Jr. Set Briefing Schedule: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Answering Brief due 2/26/2021., Reply Brief due 3/12/2021.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/27/2021. (fms)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (REFILED AT D.I. #10 - DEFICIENCY CLEARED) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Answering Brief and Response Deadline, and Defendants' Reply Brief and Reply Deadline to February 26, 2021 and March 12, 2021, Respectively - filed by Thomas Oliver, Jr. (Herr, Daniel) Modified on 1/27/2021 (fms).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emeka Igwe - filed by Tyneka Cephas. (Sharma, Aman)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Joshua J. Inkell terminated. ORDERED by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/19/2021. (fms)
January 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney: Aman K. Sharma to be substituted for Joshua J. Inkell - filed by Tyneka Cephas. (Sharma, Aman)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City Of Wilmington, Robert J. Tracy.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/27/2021. (Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by City Of Wilmington, Robert J. Tracy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Thomas Oliver, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herr, Daniel)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by City Of Wilmington, Robert J. Tracy, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: City Of Wilmington answer due 1/13/2021; Thomas Oliver, Jr answer due 1/13/2021; Robert J. Tracy answer due 1/13/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/6/2021. (nmf)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, - filed by City Of Wilmington, Robert J. Tracy. (Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Case Number N20C-10-061 AML - filed by City Of Wilmington, Robert J. Tracy, Thomas Oliver, Jr. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number DEX034764) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) Modified on 12/18/2020 (kmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cephas v. Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyneka Cephas
Represented By: Joshua J. Inkell
Represented By: Emeka Igwe
Represented By: Aman Kaushik Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Tracy
Represented By: Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Oliver, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Wilmington
Represented By: Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?