In re: Entresto (Sacubitril/Valsartan) Patent Litigation
Not Classified By Court: Biocon Pharma Limited, Hetero USA Inc.,, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Lupin Inc., Nanjing Noratech Pharmaceutical Co., Limited, Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Crystal Pharmaceutical (Suzhou) Co., Ltd., Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Laurus Generics Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, MSN Life Sciences Private Limited, Lupin Limited, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Laurus Labs Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Clerk of MDL Panel, Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Biocon Limited and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
In Re: Entresto (Sacubitril/Valsartan) Patent Litigation
Case Number: 1:2020md02930
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Crystal Pharmaceutical (Suzhou) Co., Ltd.s documents bearing Bates numbers CRYSAVA000001 - CRYSAVA011314 filed by Crystal Pharmaceutical (Suzhou) Co., Ltd..(Gattuso, Dominick)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (27 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 81 in 1:19-cv-01979-LPS) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing regarding Torrent's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Noninfringement of the '938 and '134 Patents to See Stip for details filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/13/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
May 11, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Briefing regarding Torrent's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Noninfringement of the '938 and '134 Patents to See Stip for details - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
May 8, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. re (78 in 1:19-cv-01979-LPS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Noninfringement of the '938 and '134 Patents, (20 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Noninfringement of the '938 and '134 Patents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ormerod, Eve)
May 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stuart D. Sender for Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited and Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amit Singhai filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart D. Sender filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank D. Rodriguez filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/7/20. (ntl)
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amit Singhai - filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rychlicki, Helena)
May 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank D. Rodriguez - filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rychlicki, Helena)
May 6, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart D. Sender - filed by Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rychlicki, Helena)
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Helena C. Rychlicki on behalf of Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited, Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Rychlicki, Helena)
May 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen R. Auten for Alkem Laboratories Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 1:19-cv-01979-LPS(kmd)
May 5, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alan B. Clement, Zhibin Li, and Peter J. Fallon for Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 1:19-cv-02053-LPS(sam)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Noninfringement of the '938 and '134 Patents filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Ormerod, Eve)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Noninfringement of the '938 and '134 Patents - filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ormerod, Eve)
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lupin, Ltd. for Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A.; Corporate Parent Nanomi B.V. for Lupin Inc. filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Inc., Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Roshan P. Shrestha for Alkem Laboratories Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
April 21, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward D. Pergament for Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02053-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS(sam)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (18 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 50 in 1:19-cv-02053-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan B. Clement, Peter J. Fallon and Zhibin Li filed by Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/20/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02053-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alan B. Clement, Peter J. Fallon and Zhibin Li - filed by Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd.. (Swadley, Beth)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 75 in 1:19-cv-01979-LPS) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Lupin's Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth Counterlaims without Prejudice filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve H. Ormerod on behalf of Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc.,, Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. (Ormerod, Eve)
April 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward D. Pergament for Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 1:19-cv-01979-LPS(amf)
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Crystal Pharmaceutical (Suzhou) Co., Ltd. (Gattuso, Dominick)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Joyce, Alexandra)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Silver, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (76 in 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 13 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward D. Pergament filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/9/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (49 in 1:19-cv-02053-LPS, 12 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward D. Pergament filed by Hetero USA Inc.,, Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/9/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02053-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward D. Pergament - filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward D. Pergament - filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc.,, Hetero USA Inc.. (Ormerod, Eve)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Lupin's Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth Counterlaims without Prejudice by Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A., Lupin Limited. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 3, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield for Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (56 in 1:20-cv-00445-LPS, 9 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nichols N. Kallas, Christina Schwarz, and Jared L. Stringham filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/2/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00445-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 48 in 1:19-cv-02053-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield filed by Hetero USA Inc.,, Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/2/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02053-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (74 in 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 6 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/2/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Answer to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Counterclaims by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Silver, Daniel)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nichols N. Kallas, Christina Schwarz, and Jared L. Stringham - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Nichols N. Kallas, Christina Schwarz, and Jared L. Stringham)(Silver, Daniel)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield - filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit III, Hetero USA Inc.,, Hetero USA Inc.. (Ormerod, Eve)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey E. Timlin on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Timlin, Tracey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield - filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Ormerod, Eve)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bindu Ann George Palapura on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Palapura, Bindu)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Moore, David)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (3 in 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 73 in 1:19-cv-01979-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten and Attorney Roshan P. Shrestha filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 1:20-md-02930-LPS (ntl)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen R. Auten and Attorney Roshan P. Shrestha - filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 31, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: Case from West VA was inadvertently opened as 20-MD-445. The proper case number is 20-CV-445. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00445-LPS et al.(rwc)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:20-md-2930 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password or they may continue to go through their Local Counsel. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 1:19-cv-02021-LPS, 1:19-cv-02053-LPS(rwc)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER re: 20-MD-2930 - signed 3/27/20 by Clerk, MDL Panel. (rwc)
March 27, 2020 Remark: The following cases in the District of Delaware are included in this MDL: CA 19-1979-LPS, CA 19-2021-LPS, CA 19-2053-LPS. (rwc)
March 27, 2020 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet (20-MD-2930) AND on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02930-LPS, 1:19-cv-01979-LPS, 1:19-cv-02021-LPS, 1:19-cv-02053-LPS(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Entresto (Sacubitril/Valsartan) Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Biocon Pharma Limited
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Matthew M. Holub
Represented By: Jitendra Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hetero USA Inc.,
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Torrent Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Roshan P. Shrestha
Represented By: Stephen R. Auten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Novugen Pharma (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Zhibin Li
Represented By: Peter J. Fallon
Represented By: Alan B. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hetero Labs Limited Unit III
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Nanjing Noratech Pharmaceutical Co., Limited
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: Masha Femi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Jones
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Bryan D. Beel
Represented By: Autumn Nero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Crystal Pharmaceutical (Suzhou) Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Crompton
Represented By: C. Kyle Musgrove
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Scott A. Cunning, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Atlantis Holdings, S.A.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Alembic Pharmaceuticals Limited
Represented By: Helena C. Rychlicki
Represented By: Amit Singhai
Represented By: Frank D. Rodriguez
Represented By: Stuart D. Sender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Macleods Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Laurus Generics Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D.
Represented By: Nirav N. Desai
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MSN Laboratories Private Limited
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MSN Life Sciences Private Limited
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Limited
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Alembic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Helena C. Rychlicki
Represented By: Amit Singhai
Represented By: Frank D. Rodriguez
Represented By: Stuart D. Sender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Hetero Labs Limited
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Laurus Labs Limited
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Dennies Varughese, Pharm.D.
Represented By: Nirav N. Desai
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cadila Healthcare Ltd.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea L. Cheek
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Carol M. Pitzel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk of MDL Panel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher D. Jones
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Bryan D. Beel
Represented By: Autumn Nero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Christina Schwarz
Represented By: Jared L. Stringham
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Nicholas N. Kallas
Represented By: Shannon K. Clark
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: Laura K. Fishwick
Represented By: Susanne L. Flanders
Represented By: Gregory J. Manas
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Christopher E. Loh
Represented By: Jared Stringham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Biocon Limited
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Matthew M. Holub
Represented By: Jitendra Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Karen L. Carroll
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Micheal L. Binns
Represented By: Tracey E. Timlin
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Robert L. Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Entresto (Sacubitril/Valsartan) Patent Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?