Heiser et al v. Air & Liquid System Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jean Heiser and Donald Heiser
Defendant: CBS Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, A Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation Individually & As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin, Chicago Pump Company, Westinghouse Electric Corp., Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp., Armstrong International Inc., John Crane Inc., Grinnell Corporation, sued individually and as Successor in interest to Grinnell Fire Protection Systems Company, Inc., ITT Corporation, Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., BW/IP Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 35 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling Order by CBS Corporation. (Texter, Allison) Modified on 3/4/2021 (lih).
March 4, 2021 Filing 34 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from Allison Texter, Esq.; as Defense Liaison regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. (Texter, Allison)
March 2, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
February 25, 2021 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Armstrong International Inc.. (Adams, William)
February 25, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Adams on behalf of Armstrong International Inc. (Adams, William)
February 17, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Standing Order No. 1 Interrogatories filed by Donald Heiser, Jean Heiser.(Hrubiec, R.)
February 16, 2021 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by FMC Corporation Individually & As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin, Chicago Pump Company. (Glenn, Neal)
February 10, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid System Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 3/9/2021 at 11:00 a.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 3/4/2021. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/10/2021. (lih)
February 9, 2021 Filing 27 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. re #16 Order. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., #2 Order of Dismissal as to Defendant John Crane, Inc.)(Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 2/10/2021 (lih).
February 8, 2021 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid System Corporation, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Air & Liquid System Corporation filed by Air & Liquid System Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation Individually & As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin, Chicago Pump Company. (Glenn, Neal)
February 8, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Air & Liquid System Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 5, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of FMC Corporation Individually & As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin, Chicago Pump Company (Glenn, Neal)
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
February 4, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 2/4/2021 (lih).
February 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
February 4, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #21 has been modified to reflect that the document is an ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Counsel is advised to use the appropriate event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
February 3, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants Armstrong International, Inc. and Gould Pumps, Inc. - filed by Donald Heiser, Jean Heiser. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 2/3/2021 (lih).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants Armstrong International, Inc. and Gould Pumps, Inc.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/3/2021. (lih)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BW/IP Inc.. (Doner, Joel)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Brannigan, Patrick)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/27/2021. (lih)
January 27, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc., for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Tome, Brian)
January 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Brannigan on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Brannigan, Patrick)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Doner on behalf of BW/IP Inc. (Doner, Joel)
January 22, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #12 has been modified to reflect that the document is an ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Counsel is advised to use the appropriate event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc..(Tome, Brian) Modified on 1/22/2021 (lih).
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tome on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Tome, Brian)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Costello, Kelly)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 1/14/2021 (lih).
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas E. Skiles on behalf of Crane Co. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
January 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 6, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusement, Inc. for CBS Corporation. CBS Corporation (n/k/a ViacomCBS Inc. following the merger of Viacom Inc. with and into CBS Corporation on December 4, 2019, with CBS Corporation continuing as the surviving corporation, which has been renamed ViacomCBS Inc.) filed by CBS Corporation. (mal)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct., Case Number N20C-10-053 ASB (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3438843)- filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heiser et al v. Air & Liquid System Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Tome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Ahern
Represented By: Patrick Brannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, A Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Tome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation Individually & As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin, Chicago Pump Company
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp.
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Represented By: William R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation, sued individually and as Successor in interest to Grinnell Fire Protection Systems Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc.
Represented By: Joel M. Doner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Heiser
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Heiser
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?