Roberts v. Saul
Plaintiff: Denise Painter Roberts
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00014
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summonses served on U.S. Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney on February 4, 2021, filed by Denise Painter Roberts. (Linarducci, Gary)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Benderson, Heather)
January 19, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward A. Wicklund for Denise Painter Roberts added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Wicklund filed by Denise Painter Roberts. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/14/2021. (dlw)
January 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Wicklund - filed by Denise Painter Roberts. (Linarducci, Gary)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3448017.) - filed by Denise Painter Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Heather Benderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Painter Roberts
Represented By: Gary C. Linarducci
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?