AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Robert P. Charrow, Thomas J. Engels, Alex M. Azar, II, Health Resources and Services Administration, The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of, Dan Barry, Diana Espinosa and Norris Cochran
Case Number: 1:2021cv00027
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Dan Barry, Norris Cochran, Diana Espinosa, Health Resources and Services Administration, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2021. (Westmoreland, Rachael)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2021. (Silver, Daniel)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William B. Schultz, Margaret M. Dotzel, Casey Trombley-Shapiro Jonas, and Ariella Muller - filed by The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William B. Schultz, #2 Certification of Margaret M. Dotzel, #3 Certification of Casey Trombley-Shapiro Jonas, #4 Certification of Ariella Muller)(Butcher, Rebecca)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William B. Schultz, Margaret M. Dotzel, Casey Trombley-Shapiro Jonas, and Ariella Muller filed by The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/10/21. (ntl)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of Health-System Pharmacists for The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of filed by The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of. (Butcher, Rebecca)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION re #33 MOTION to Intervene by The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Butcher, Rebecca)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Intervene - filed by The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of Health-System Pharmacists. (Butcher, Rebecca)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference on held on February 19, 2021 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, email: gaffigan@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2021. (bpg)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule on Cross-Motions -- An Oral Argument is set for 6/10/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/24/21. (ntl)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 2/15/2021 as to David C. Weiss, U.S. Attorney for the District of Delaware, U.S. Department of Justice. (Joyce, Alexandra)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of Service for Monty Wilkinson made on February 15, 2021 by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Service for Health Resources and Services Administration made on February 15, 2021 by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Service for U.S. Department of Heath and Human Services made on February 15, 2021 by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Service for Diana Espinosa made on February 15, 2021 by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION of Service of Norris Cochran made on February 15, 2021 by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Service of Dan Barry made on February 15, 2021 by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule on Cross-Motions re Telephone Conference by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Motion to Expedite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 2/19/2021. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Expedition filed by Dan Barry, Norris Cochran, Diana Espinosa, Health Resources and Services Administration, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/25/2021. (Westmoreland, Rachael)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Westmoreland on behalf of All Defendants (Westmoreland, Rachael)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and motion to expedite, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) Defendants shall, by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 18, file a letter brief, not to exceed five pages single-spaced, setting out their response to the motion to expedite and their position on how this case should proceed; (ii) Plaintiff shall, by no later than 12:00 p.m. on Friday, February 19 file a reply letter brief, not to exceed two pages single-spaced; and (iii) the Court will hold a status teleconference on Friday, February 19 at 4:30 p.m. Plaintiff shall make the arrangements for the call. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/15/21. (ntl)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Requesting Telephonic Status Conference - re #17 MOTION for Expedition , #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Expedition - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1. Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Odalys Caprisecca by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1. Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Health Resources and Services Administration, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Norris Cochran, Dan Barry, Diana Espinosa- filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey L. Handwerker for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sally Pei for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephen K. Wirth for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allon Kedem, Jeffrey L. Handwerker, Sally L. Pei and Stephen K. Wirth filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/20/21. (ntl)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Allon Kedem for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Service of the Summons, Complaint, and Related Papers upon Jeffrey Rosen, Acting Attorney General at the U.S. Department of Justice by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Related Papers upon Defendant Health Resources and Services Administration by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Related Papers upon Defendant Thomas J. Engels by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Related Papers upon Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Related Papers upon Defendant Robert P. Charrow by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Service of the Summons, Complaint, and Related Papers upon Defendant Alex M. Azar, II by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 1/13/21 as to David C. Weiss, U.S. Attorney for the District of Delaware, U.S. Department of Justice. (Silver, Daniel)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allon Kedem, Jeffrey L. Handwerker, Sally L. Pei and Stephen K. Wirth - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Certification of Allon Kedem, #2 Pro Hac Certification of Jeffrey L. Handwerker, #3 Pro Hac Certification of Sally L. Pei, #4 Pro Hac Certification of Stephen K. Wirth)(Silver, Daniel)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Robert P. Charrow, Thomas J. Engels, Health Resources and Services Administration, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Jeffrey A. Rosen (U.S. Attorney General), and David C. Weiss (U.S. Attorney). (Attachments: #1 Summons- Robert P. Charrow, #2 Summons- Thomas J. Engels, #3 Summons- Health Resources and Services Administration, #4 Summons- U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #5 Summons- Jeffrey A. Rosen, #6 Summons- David C. Weiss)(sam)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca plc for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (sam)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Alex M. Azar, II, Robert P. Charrow, Thomas J. Engels, Health Resources and Services Administration, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3458393.) - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Charrow
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Engels
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Resources and Services Administration
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Hospital Association, 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, the Association of American Medical Colleges, the Children's Hospital Association, and the American Society of
Represented By: Rebecca Lyn Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Barry
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Espinosa
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Cochran
Represented By: Rachael Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Sally Pei
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Allon Kedem
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Handwerker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?