Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00035
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:20-cv-01105-MN. (dlw)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SO ORDERED re (40 in 1:20-cv-01214-MN, 32 in 1:20-cv-01155-MN, 36 in 1:20-cv-01215-MN, 34 in 1:20-cv-01154-MN, 21 in 1:21-cv-00035-MN, 38 in 1:20-cv-01105-MN) Stipulation and Order to Consolidate. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN C.A. NO. 20-1105. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/12/2021. (dlw)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and Order to Consolidate by Intercept Pharma Europe Limited, Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe Ltd.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Having been advised by the parties of their inability to resolve protective order disputes, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephone Conference is set for 4/13/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. The opening letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, is due on or before 4/7/2021 and shall attach a copy of the proposed protective order setting forth Plaintiffs' and Defendants' positions. The responsive letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, is due on or before 4/8/2021. Counsel shall provide a dial-in number for the teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/9/2021. (dlw)
March 3, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Identifying Defendants' Accused Products and Plaintiffs' Asserted Patents filed by Intercept Pharma Europe Limited, Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (37 in 1:20-cv-01214-MN, 31 in 1:20-cv-01154-MN, 17 in 1:21-cv-00035-MN, 32 in 1:20-cv-01105-MN, 33 in 1:20-cv-01215-MN, 29 in 1:20-cv-01155-MN) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to March 5, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/26/2021. (dlw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit a Proposed Protective Order to March 5, 2021 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Ormerod, Eve)
February 22, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Jovial Wong, Bryce A. Cooper, Alison M. Heydorn for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin E. Warner, Jovial Wong, Bryce A. Cooper, and Alison M. Heydorn filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/19/2021. (dlw)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re (35 in 1:20-cv-01214-MN, 27 in 1:20-cv-01155-MN, 30 in 1:20-cv-01105-MN, 31 in 1:20-cv-01215-MN, 29 in 1:20-cv-01154-MN, 15 in 1:21-cv-00035-MN) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to February 26, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/19/2021. (dlw)
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin E. Warner, Jovial Wong, Bryce A. Cooper, and Alison M. Heydorn - filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD.. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to February 26, 2021 - filed by Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(A)(1) and 2) Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of The Default Standard For Discovery filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD..(Wilson, Samantha)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha G. Wilson on behalf of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Sipes, Jeffrey B. Elikan, Megan Keane, Jeremy D. Cobb, Douglas A. Behrens, Laura Dolbow, and Mary Swears filed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/10/2021. (dlw)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Sipes, Jeffrey B. Elikan, Megan Keane, Jeremy D. Cobb, Douglas A. Behrens, Laura Dolbow, and Mary Swears - filed by Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD.. (Gaza, Anne)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc..(Gaza, Anne)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(A)(1); and (2) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Intercept Pharma Europe Limited, Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.: For Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.: For Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Intercept Pharma Europe LTD., Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (myr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE 48,286 ;9,238,673 ;10,047,117 ;10,052,337 ;10,174,073 ;10,751,349 ;10,758,549. (myr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No earlier than 12/1/2020. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 11/27/2023. (myr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3461795.) - filed by Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, LTD.
Represented By: Bryce A. Cooper
Represented By: Alison M. Heydorn
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Bryce A. Cooper
Represented By: Alison M. Heydorn
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercept Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Andrew Mark Moshos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercept Pharma Europe LTD.
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Andrew Mark Moshos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?