Gibson v. ViacomCBS Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Gibson
Defendant: Grinnell LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Viacom Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., ViaCom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp., Cleaver-Brooks, A Division of Aqua-Chem Inc., Square D Co., Crane Co., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corp., Johnson Controls Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, Grinnell Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, DAP, Inc., ITT Corporation, Cummins, Inc., Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Eaton Corporation and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00063
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Gibson as to A.W. Chesterton Company (Hrubiec, R.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Costello, Kelly)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 3/30/2021 at 10:00 a.m. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 3/25/2021. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/26/2021. (lih)
February 25, 2021 Filing 32 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding Service of the Complaint, Defendants' Answers, and R.16 Conference. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation)(Hrubiec, R.)
February 17, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Standing Order No. 1 Interrogatories filed by Richard Gibson.(Hrubiec, R.)
February 12, 2021 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Adams, William)
February 12, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Adams, William) Modified on 2/12/2021 (lih).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/11/2021. (lih)
February 10, 2021 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Other Affiliate Electric Holding Amerique de Nord for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Glenn, Neal)
February 10, 2021 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by FMC Corporation. (Glenn, Neal)
February 10, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cummins, Inc.. (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 10, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
February 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Adams on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Adams, William)
February 2, 2021 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation filed by Eaton Corporation. (Texter, Allison)
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Texter on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Texter, Allison)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation. (Glenn, Neal)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of FMC Corporation (Glenn, Neal)
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Glenn, Neal)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Glenn, Neal)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DAP, Inc.. (Brannigan, Patrick)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Brannigan, Patrick)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Brannigan on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Brannigan, Patrick)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate The Dow Chemical Company, Other Affiliate DowDuPont Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Naylor, Joseph)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Naylor on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Naylor, Joseph)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis C. Gondek on behalf of Crane Co. (Gondek, Francis)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Brannigan on behalf of DAP, Inc. (Brannigan, Patrick)
January 27, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb)
January 27, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: deleted earlier docket entry assigning case to incorrect Judge. Corrected to case being assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. (rjb)
January 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc. - filed by ViacomCBS Inc. (kmd)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court for New Castle County, Delaware, Case Number N20C-11-136 ASB (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3478475)- filed by ViacomCBS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Ahern
Represented By: Patrick Brannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViaCom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., A Pennsylvania Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, A Division of Aqua-Chem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Co.
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Joseph S. Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Ahern
Represented By: Patrick Brannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gibson
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?