FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. v. Viking Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Viking Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00072
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Viking Technologies, LLC's Counterclaims to FedEx's Complaint filed by Viking Technologies, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Golden, Ronald)
March 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark S. Raskin for Viking Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
March 5, 2021 Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Viking Technologies, LLC's Counterclaims to FedEx's Complaint filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2021. (Poff, Adam)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Viking Technologies, LLC's Counterclaims to FedEx's Complaint - filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Poff, Adam)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #8 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. by Viking Technologies, LLC.(Golden, Ronald)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine Vidal and Jeanifer E. Parsigian filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/4/2021. (fms)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine Vidal and Jeanifer E. Parsigian - filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Raskin, Robert A. Whitman, Michael DeVincenzo, Andrea Pacelli, Charles Wizenfeld, Eric Berger, John Petrsoric, and Elizabeth Long filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/1/2021. (fms)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Raskin, Robert A. Whitman, Michael DeVincenzo, Andrea Pacelli, Charles Wizenfeld, Eric Berger, John Petrsoric, and Elizabeth Long - filed by Viking Technologies, LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,888,953 and 10,220,537 against Viking Technologies, LLC - filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Poff, Adam)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM of Defendant Viking Technologies, LLC against FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. by Viking Technologies, LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Mailing to Defendant Viking Technologies, LLC pursuant to 10 Del. C. Sec. 3104 by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Poff, Adam)
January 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. - filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. (amf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,888,953 and 10,220,537. (amf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against Viking Technologies, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3487081.) - filed by FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc. v. Viking Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Represented By: Mark S. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FedEx Supply Chain Logistics & Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?