Harper v. Kriss Contracting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Harper
Defendant: Veronica Kriss, Kathleen A. Kriss and Kriss Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00081
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Angeli Murthy for William Harper added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angeli Murthy filed by William Harper. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/10/2021. (fms)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angeli Murthy - filed by William Harper. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Culley, David)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Complaint served on Kathleen A. Kriss on 2/5/2021, filed by William Harper. (Culley, David)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Complaint served on Kathleen A. Kriss on behalf of Veronica Kriss on 2/4/2021, filed by William Harper. (Culley, David)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Complaint served on Kathleen A. Kriss on 2/4/2021, filed by William Harper. (Culley, David)
February 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Kathleen A. Kriss, Veronica Kriss, Kriss Contracting, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3489995.) - filed by William Harper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Kriss Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Kriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen A. Kriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kriss Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harper
Represented By: David G. Culley
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?