Decatur Licensing LLC v. LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Decatur Licensing LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00106
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(mdb)
March 3, 2021 CASE CLOSED (dlw)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Decatur Licensing LLC as to LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 04/05/2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: LG Electronics USA, Inc. answer due 4/5/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/17/2021. (dlw)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 04/05/2021 - filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy)
February 5, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Decatur Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00108-MN, 1:21-cv-00106-MN. (kmd)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/5/2021. (dlw)
February 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00106-MN, 1:21-cv-00108-MN (rjb)
February 3, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI #6 Replaced per counsels request. (apk)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Decatur Licensing LLC. LG Electronics USA, Inc. served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. (Chong, Jimmy)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/3/2021) (apk).
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (myr)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,706,467. (myr)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against LG Electronics USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3494744.) - filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decatur Licensing LLC v. LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Decatur Licensing LLC
Represented By: Jimmy C. Chong
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?