Bial - Portela & CA S.A. et al V. Apotex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bial - Holding, S.A. and Bial - Portela & CA S.A.
Defendant: Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00187
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Contentions for Patent No. 10,912,781 filed by Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A..(Balick, Steven)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A..(Balick, Steven)
March 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys James B. Monroe and Meredith H. Boerschlein for Bial - Holding, S.A. and Bial - Portela & CA S.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00186-CFC, 1:21-cv-00187-CFC, 1:21-cv-00188-CFC, 1:21-cv-00189-CFC, 1:21-cv-00190-CFC. (kmd)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Jennifer H. Roscetti, Charles T. Collins-Chase, Lauren J. Dowty, Meredith H. Boerschlein, and Ryan V. McDonnell - filed by Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A.. (Balick, Steven)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (13 in 1:21-cv-00188-CFC, 11 in 1:21-cv-00189-CFC, 13 in 1:21-cv-00187-CFC, 10 in 1:21-cv-00186-CFC, 14 in 1:21-cv-00190-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Jennifer H. Roscetti, Charles T. Collins-Chase, Lauren J. Dowty, Meredith H. Boerschlein, and Ryan V. McDonnell filed by Bial - Portela & CA S.A., Bial - Holding, S.A. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/16/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00186-CFC, 1:21-cv-00187-CFC, 1:21-cv-00188-CFC, 1:21-cv-00189-CFC, 1:21-cv-00190-CFC(fms)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:21-cv-00189-CFC, 9 in 1:21-cv-00187-CFC, 7 in 1:21-cv-00186-CFC, 9 in 1:21-cv-00190-CFC, 9 in 1:21-cv-00188-CFC) STIPULATION Seeking Adoption of the Original and Once-Daily Scheduling Order in the New Cases Asserting the '781 Patent, by Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/11/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00186-CFC, 1:21-cv-00187-CFC, 1:21-cv-00188-CFC, 1:21-cv-00189-CFC, 1:21-cv-00190-CFC(nmf)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Apotex Inc.'s and Apotex Corp.'s Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and Defendants Apotex Inc.s and Apotex Corp.'s Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Tancredi, Damien)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to Apotex Defendants and Plaintiffs' Second Amended Initial Disclosures to Apotex Defendants Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by BIAL - PORTELA & CA. S.A., Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Seeking Adoption of the Original and Once-Daily Scheduling Order in the New Cases Asserting the '781 Patent, by Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A.. (Balick, Steven)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Pharmaceutical Holdings Inc. for Apotex Inc. filed by Apotex Inc.. (Tancredi, Damien)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Apotex Holdings Inc. for Apotex Corp. filed by Apotex Corp.. (Tancredi, Damien)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A., Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc. by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Tancredi, Damien)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bial - Holding, S.A. for Bial - Portela & CA S.A.; Corporate Parent Sumitomo Dainippon Pharma Co., Ltd. for Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Bial - Holding, S.A., Bial - Portela & CA S.A., Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
February 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00186-CFC, 1:21-cv-00187-CFC, 1:21-cv-00188-CFC, 1:21-cv-00189-CFC, 1:21-cv-00190-CFC (rjb)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: N/A. Date of Expiration of Patent: 10/23/28.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/8/2021. (apk)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,912,781. (apk)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3518016.) - filed by Bial - Holding, S.A., Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bial - Portela & CA S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
February 10, 2021 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bial - Portela & CA S.A. et al V. Apotex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunovion Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jennifer Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bial - Holding, S.A.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Meredith H. Boerschlein
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bial - Portela & CA S.A.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Meredith H. Boerschlein
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?