Ebury Street Capital, LLC et al v. McOsker et al
Plaintiff: Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, EB 2EMIALA, LLC, EB 1EMIALA, LLC and Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC
Defendant: Andrew Kernan, LienClear, LLC, LienClear 0002, LLC, BCMG International, LLC, Sitona Ventures LLC, Badel Hernandez, BCMG Services, Inc., BloxTrade, LLC, LienClear 0001, LLC, Cactus Ventures LLC and Thomas R. McOsker
Case Number: 1:2021cv00203
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED re #9 Stipulation of Waiver and to Extend Time (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: BCMG International, LLC answer due 5/10/2021; BCMG Services, Inc. answer due 5/10/2021; BloxTrade, LLC answer due 5/10/2021; Cactus Ventures LLC answer due 5/10/2021; Badel Hernandez answer due 5/10/2021; Andrew Kernan answer due 5/10/2021; LienClear 0001, LLC answer due 5/10/2021; LienClear 0002, LLC answer due 5/10/2021; LienClear, LLC answer due 5/10/2021; Thomas R. McOsker answer due 5/10/2021; Sitona Ventures LLC answer due 5/10/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/2/2021. (dlw)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Whalen filed by EB 1EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, EB 2EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/2/2021. (dlw)
March 2, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ryan J. Whalen for EB 1EMIALA, LLC, for EB 2EMIALA, LLC, for Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, for Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC, for Ebury Street Capital, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Waiver and to Extend Time by BCMG International, LLC, BCMG Services, Inc., BloxTrade, LLC, Cactus Ventures LLC, Badel Hernandez, Andrew Kernan, LienClear 0001, LLC, LienClear 0002, LLC, LienClear, LLC, Thomas R. McOsker, Sitona Ventures LLC. (Bennett, Blake)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EB 2EMIALA, LLC, EB 1EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC. LienClear 0002, LLC served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Miller, Kathleen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EB 2EMIALA, LLC, EB 1EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC. LienClear 0001, LLC served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Miller, Kathleen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EB 2EMIALA, LLC, EB 1EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC. Sitona Ventures LLC served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Miller, Kathleen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EB 2EMIALA, LLC, EB 1EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC. Cactus Ventures LLC served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Miller, Kathleen)
February 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan J. Whalen - filed by EB 1EMIALA, LLC, EB 2EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC. (Miller, Kathleen)
February 16, 2021 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to BCMG International, LLC, BCMG Services, Inc., BloxTrade, LLC, Cactus Ventures LLC, Badel Hernandez, Andrew Kernan, LienClear 0001, LLC, LienClear 0002, LLC, LienClear, LLC, Thomas R. McOsker, and Sitona Ventures LLC on 2/16/2021. (cna, )
February 16, 2021 No Summons Issued. (amf)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by EB 1EMIALA, LLC, EB 2EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC. (amf)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against BCMG International, LLC, BCMG Services, Inc., BloxTrade, LLC, Cactus Ventures LLC, Andrew Kernan, LienClear 0001, LLC, LienClear 0002, LLC, LienClear, LLC, Thomas R. McOsker, Sitona Ventures LLC, Badel Hernandez - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3522089) - filed by EB 2EMIALA, LLC, EB 1EMIALA, LLC, Ebury Street Capital, LLC, Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC, Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebury Street Capital, LLC et al v. McOsker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebury Fund 2 NJ, LLC
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Miller
Represented By: Ryan J. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebury Street Capital, LLC
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Miller
Represented By: Ryan J. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EB 2EMIALA, LLC
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Miller
Represented By: Ryan J. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EB 1EMIALA, LLC
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Miller
Represented By: Ryan J. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebury Fund 1 NJ, LLC
Represented By: Julie M. O'Dell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Miller
Represented By: Ryan J. Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kernan
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LienClear, LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LienClear 0002, LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCMG International, LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sitona Ventures LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badel Hernandez
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCMG Services, Inc.
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BloxTrade, LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LienClear 0001, LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus Ventures LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. McOsker
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?