Blackburn v. Calder, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Charles R. Blackburn
Defendant: Howard E. Janzen, Julius Erving, Michael Sicoli, H. Brian Thompson, Chris McKee, Rhodric C. Hackman, Gina Nomellini, Elizabeth Satin, Nick Adamo, Theodore B. Smith, III, S. Joseph Bruno and Richard D. Calder, Jr.
Nominal Defendant: GTT Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00211
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED re #5 Stipulation and Order Concerning Waiver of Service of Summons and Response Deadline (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Nick Adamo answer due 6/8/2021; S. Joseph Bruno answer due 6/8/2021; Richard D. Calder, Jr. answer due 6/8/2021; Julius Erving answer due 6/8/2021; GTT Communications, Inc. answer due 6/8/2021; Rhodric C. Hackman answer due 6/8/2021; Howard E. Janzen answer due 6/8/2021; Chris McKee answer due 6/8/2021; Gina Nomellini answer due 6/8/2021; Elizabeth Satin answer due 6/8/2021; Michael Sicoli answer due 6/8/2021; Theodore B. Smith, III answer due 6/8/2021; H. Brian Thompson answer due 6/8/2021). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/14/2021. (dlw)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Concerning Waiver of Service of Summons and Response Deadline by Charles R. Blackburn. (Farnan, Brian)
February 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 16, 2021 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (myr)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #1 MOTION to Seal Document: filed by Charles R. Blackburn. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event Defendants contend the Complaint shall remained sealed, Defendants shall move to maintain the sealing of the Complaint within 21 days of service of the Complaint; and IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event Defendants agree the Complaint should be public or fails to timely move to maintain the sealing of the Complaint, Plaintiff shall publicly file the Complaint within 28 days of service of the Complaint. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/16/2021. (nmf)
February 16, 2021 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (CFC) via e-mail. (myr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 [SEALED] VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Nick Adamo, S. Joseph Bruno, Richard D. Calder, Jr., Julius Erving, GTT Communications, Inc., Rhodric C. Hackman, Howard E. Janzen, Chris McKee, Gina Nomellini, Elizabeth Satin, Michael Sicoli, Theodore B. Smith, III, H. Brian Thompson - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3526366.) - filed by Charles R. Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Charles R. Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Calder, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard E. Janzen
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Erving
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sicoli
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Brian Thompson
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McKee
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodric C. Hackman
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Nomellini
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Satin
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Adamo
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore B. Smith, III
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Joseph Bruno
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Calder, Jr.
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: GTT Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Rudolf Koch
Represented By: Dorronda R. Bordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Blackburn
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?