Menzies v. Seyfarth Shaw LLP et al
Plaintiff: Steven Menzies
Defendant: Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Northern Trust Corporation, Christiana Bank & Trust Company and Graham Taylor
Case Number: 1:2021cv00249
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys H. Nicholas Berberian and Kyle D. Rettberg for Northern Trust Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #259 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney H. Nicholas Berberian and Kyle D. Rettberg filed by Northern Trust Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/30/21. (ntl)
March 29, 2021 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Philip Rollo on behalf of Northern Trust Corporation (Rollo, Richard)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #260 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants Answer to the Second Amended Complaint to through and including May 24, 2021 filed by Northern Trust Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/29/21. (ntl)
March 26, 2021 Filing 260 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants Answer to the Second Amended Complaint to through and including May 24, 2021 - filed by Northern Trust Corporation. (Delcollo, Renee)
March 26, 2021 Filing 259 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney H. Nicholas Berberian and Kyle D. Rettberg - filed by Northern Trust Corporation. (Delcollo, Renee)
March 25, 2021 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Mosley Delcollo on behalf of Northern Trust Corporation (Delcollo, Renee)
March 25, 2021 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Steven Hunter on behalf of Northern Trust Corporation (Hunter, Travis)
March 25, 2021 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Charles Herr on behalf of Steven Menzies (Herr, Daniel)
March 25, 2021 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Gamgort on behalf of Christiana Bank & Trust Company (Gamgort, William)
February 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 23, 2021 Filing 254 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/25/2021. (sam)
February 23, 2021 Filing 253 Record of case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number in Other District: 1:15-cv-03403. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 21, 2021 Filing 252 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 251 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/19/2021. Mailed notice(gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 250 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: For the reasons explained in the accompanying memorandum opinion and order, this Court grants Christiana's motion to dismiss #242 for lack of personal jurisdiction and finds that the interests of justice are served by transferring this case to the District of Delaware. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 249 REPLY by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #242 Christiana Bank & Trust Company's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 248 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction DEFENDANT CHRISTIANA BANK & TRUST COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STAT #242 (Altman, Erin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 247 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file response #245 is granted and response shall be filed on or before 8/10/2020. Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before 8/31/2020. The Court will rule on the pending motion #242 in due course and set additional case management dates as needed in a future order. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 246 STATUS Report by Steven Menzies (Altman, Erin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 245 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #242 (Altman, Erin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 244 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's second amended complaint #242 . Based upon the parties' agreement and consistent with the joint status report, #241 , the Court sets a briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before 7/20/20; Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before 8/3/20. Additionally, the parties shall file an updated joint status report by 7/21/20 that includes a proposed case management schedule (including deadlines for expert discovery and dispositive motions, as appropriate). The Court will rule on the pending motion #242 in due course and set additional case management dates as needed in a future order. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 243 MEMORANDUM by Christiana Bank & Trust Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #242 DEFENDANT CHRISTIANA BANK & TRUST COMPANY'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 242 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company , MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction DEFENDANT CHRISTIANA BANK & TRUST COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 241 STATUS Report by Steven Menzies (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 240 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA FINAL JUDGMENT dated 12/12/19 regarding notice of appeal #233 ; USCA No. 18-3232; The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED in part, VACATED in part, and REMANDED for proceedings consistent with the opinion. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. Both sides to bear their own costs. form name. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 239 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 12/12/19 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #233 ; Appellate case no. : 18-3232; Plaintiff-appellant filed a petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc on November 26, 2019. No Judge in regular active service has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc, and all members of the original panel have voted to deny panel rehearing. The petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc is therefore DENIED. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 238 MANDATE of USCA dated 12/20/19 regarding notice of appeal #233 ;USCA No.18-3232 ; No record to be returned. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER dated 2/12/2019 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #233 ; Appellate case no. : 18-3232; IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Appellant shall resubmit his opening brief along with redacted and unredacted versions of his appendix by February 19, 2019. The clerk of this court shall maintain the unredacted appendix under seal and file the redacted version in the public record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 236 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #233 ; USCA Case No. 18-3232 (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 235 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #233 . Notified counsel (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #233 . (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 233 NOTICE of appeal by Steven Menzies regarding orders #232 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-15060390. Receipt number: n (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 232 ENTERED JUDGMENT Mailed notice(gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 231 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/21/2018. Mailed notice(gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 230 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, this Court grants Defendants' motions to dismiss #169 #172 #175 , and grants Plaintiff's motions to strike #182 #184 #186 . Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 165 is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 229 RESPONSE by Steven Menzies to MOTION by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor to compel #226 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 228 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' motion to compel #226 by 4/16/18. This Court will issue a ruling by separate written order. The notice of motion set for 4/5/18 is stricken and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 227 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Gehringer for presentment of motion to compel, #226 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/5/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 226 MOTION by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor to compel (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Minute entry dated 2/8/2018 #224 is stricken and corrected as follows: Motion to withdraw appearance of Daniel A. Dorfman #221 is granted. Motion hearing set for 2/20/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 224 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Entered in error. Modified on 2/8/2018 (gel, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 223 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Menzies by Robert Jay Harris (Harris, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to withdraw #221 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/20/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 221 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to withdraw Appearance of Daniel A. Dorfman (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants' agreed motion to redact transcript of proceedings held on 11/2/17 #218 is granted, and the redactions listed in Defendants' motion ( #218 , paragraph 8(a) through 8(k)), are permitted in docket entry #217 . The 2/1/18 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE of Motion by Keith G. Klein for presentment of Motion to Redact Transcript #218 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/1/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Klein, Keith) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 218 MOTION to Redact transcript #217 of Proceedings Held on 11-2-17 (Agreed) (Klein, Keith) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/02/2017 before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Order Number: 28876. Court Reporter Contact Information: Lisa H. Breiter lisa_breiter@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 818-6683. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2018. (Breiter, Lisa) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 11/2/2017. Defendant's motions to dismiss #169 , #172 , #175 and Plaintiff's motions to strike #182 , #184 and #186 are taken under advisement and the Court will rule by separate order. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 215 SEALED REPLY by Northern Trust Corporation to MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Northern Trust Corporations Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #169 NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 214 SEALED REPLY by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #172 (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 213 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Defendants' motions for leave to file under seal #204 and #208 are granted, and Defendants are given leave to file their reply briefs under seal. The 10/19/17 Notice of Motion dates are stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 212 REPLY by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #175 CHRISTIANA BANK & TRUST COMPANY'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 211 RESPONSE by Christiana Bank & Trust Company to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to strike memorandum in support of motion #178 Exhibits Attached to Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Motion to Dismiss #182 CHRISTIANA BANK & TRUST COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS ATTACHED TO MOTION TO DISMISS (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 210 RESPONSE by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylorin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to strike memorandum in support of motion #173 (Exhibits Attached to Seyfarth and Taylor's Motion to Dismiss) #186 (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 209 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Gehringer for presentment of motion for leave to file #208 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/19/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 208 MOTION by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor for leave to file Under Seal Docket No. 203 (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 207 RESPONSE by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation Northern Trust Corp. Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibits Attached to Northern Trust Motion to Dismiss (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 206 REPLY by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation [Redacted] Northern Trust Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 205 Notice of Motion For Leave To File Under Seal Northern Trust Corporations Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion to seal document #204 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/19/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 204 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to seal document MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 203 REPLY by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor [Redacted] (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Northern Trust Corporation's agreed motion for extension of time to file reply #200 is granted, and Defendant shall file its reply by 10/13/17. Plaintiff's motions to strike [182, 184, 186] are entered and continued to 11/2/17 and will be taken up with the motions to dismiss; to the extent any Defendant wishes to file a response to a motion to strike, it should do so by 10/20/17. Plaintiff's motions to seal [191, 193, 195] are granted. The 10/10/17 and 10/24/17 Notice of Motion dates are stricken, and the parties need not appear. The motion hearing previously set for 11/2/17 stands. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 201 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #200 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/10/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 200 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation for extension of time to file response/reply as to response in opposition to motion, #189 AGREED (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 199 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion to reset motion hearing is granted. Motion hearing previously set for 10/24/2017 is reset for 11/2/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 198 SEALED RESPONSE by Steven Menzies to MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #175 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 197 SEALED RESPONSE by Steven Menzies to MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Northern Trust Corporations Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #169 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 196 SEALED RESPONSE by Steven Menzies to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #172 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to seal Response to Seyfarth Shaw LLP and Graham Taylor's Motion to Dismiss (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to seal #193 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/24/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 193 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to seal Response to Northern Trust Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 192 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to seal #191 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/24/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 191 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to seal Response to Christiana Bank and Trust Co.'s Motion to Dismiss (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 190 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #175 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 189 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Northern Trust Corporations Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #169 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 188 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #172 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 187 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to strike #186 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/24/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 186 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to strike memorandum in support of motion #173 (Exhibits Attached to Seyfarth and Taylor's Motion to Dismiss) (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 185 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to strike, #184 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/24/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 184 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to strike MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Northern Trust Corporations Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #169 (Exhibits Attached to Northern Trust's Motion to Dismiss) (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 183 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to strike #182 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/24/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 182 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to strike memorandum in support of motion #178 Exhibits Attached to Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Motion to Dismiss (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 181 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Northern Trust Corporation's motion for leave to file under seal #167 is granted. The 9/12/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Defendants' amended motions to dismiss [ #169 , #172 , #175 shall be taken up at the motion hearing previously set for 10/24/2017 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's motion to seal exhibits #176 is granted. The 9/12/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 179 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM by Christiana Bank & Trust Company in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #175 and failure to state a claim (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE of Motion by Amy Yongmee Cho for presentment of motion to seal #176 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/12/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 176 MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to seal exhibits to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Gehringer for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #172 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/12/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #172 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 172 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 171 RESPONSE by Northern Trust Corporationin Support of MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to seal document MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #167 , MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Northern Trust Corporations Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #169 REDACTED NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 170 Notice of Northern Trust Corporations Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion to dismiss #169 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/12/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 169 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Northern Trust Corporations Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 168 Notice of Northern Trust Corporations Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Northern Trust Corporations Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion to seal document #167 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/12/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 167 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to seal document MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 166 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: After in camera inspection of the subject memorandum, Plaintiff's motion to compel #154 is denied. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 165 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Steven Menzies SEALED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 164 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Steven Menzies against All Defendants [REDACTED VERSION] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 8, 2017 Filing 163 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion to compel #154 remains under advisement, and Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company shall deliver a copy of the disputed Meigs Memorandum to chambers for an in camera inspection on or before 8/14/2017. The Court shall rule on the motion to compel by separate written order. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint #138 is granted, and Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint under seal as a separate docket entry instanter. The Defendants' motions to dismiss the First Amended Complaint #105 , #108 and #114 , are denied without prejudice. On or before 9/5/2017, Defendants may file amended versions of their motions to dismiss (revised to address the Second Amended Complaint); Plaintiff shall file its response on or before 9/26/2017; and Defendants shall file their replies on or before 10/10/2017. In light of the availability of discovery and the prior opportunities to amend the complaint, no further amendments will be permitted absent a sufficient showing of good cause. Plaintiff's motion to strike #132 is denied as moot. This case is set for a final hearing on the motions to dismiss at 9:45 a.m., on 10/24/2017, in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 18, 2017 Filing 162 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file reply and certain exhibits under seal #158 is granted. The 7/27/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 161 SEALED REPLY by Steven Menzies to response in opposition to motion, #157 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 160 REPLY by Steven Menzies to response in opposition to motion, #157 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion for leave to file #158 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/27/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 158 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel and Certain Confidential Exhibits Under Seal (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 157 RESPONSE by Christiana Bank & Trust Companyin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Christiana Bank & Trust Company to Produce #154 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Briefing on Plaintiff's motion to compel #154 is set as follows: Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company shall file a response by 7/10/17 and Plaintiff shall file a reply by 7/17/17. The 6/29/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to compel #154 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/29/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 19, 2017 Filing 154 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Christiana Bank & Trust Company to Produce (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 153 SEALED RESPONSE by Northern Trust Corporation to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Second amended Complaint #138 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rettberg, Kyle)[Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 152 SEALED RESPONSE Opposition of Seyfarth Shaw LLP and Graham Taylor to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 151 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants' motions for leave to file under seal #145 , #149 are granted. The 6/20/17 and 6/22/17 Notice of Motion dates are stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )[Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion for leave to file #149 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/22/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 149 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation for leave to file Under Seal Northern Trust Corporation's Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 148 RESPONSE by Northern Trust Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Second amended Complaint #138 REDACTED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 147 RESPONSE by Christiana Bank & Trust Companyin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Second amended Complaint #138 (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Gehringer for presentment of motion for leave to file #145 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/20/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 145 MOTION by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor for leave to file Under Seal Docket No. 144 (Opposition of Seyfarth Shaw LLP and Graham Taylor to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 144 REDACTED Opposition of Seyfarth Shaw LLP and Graham Taylor to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor (Gehringer, Matthew) Modified on 6/13/2017 (ks, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 143 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file proposed second amended complaint under seal #141 is granted, as stated in open court on 5/16/17. The 6/6/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended complaint #138 shall be briefed according to the schedule previously set by the Court. See #136 . Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion for leave to file #141 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/6/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 141 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file proposed second amended complaint under seal (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 140 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Steven Menzies regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Second amended Complaint #138 (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 139 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Steven Menzies [REDACTED VERSION] regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Second amended Complaint #138 (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Second amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 22, 2017 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/16/17 before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Court Reporter Contact Information: Lisa Breiter lisa_breiter@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 818-6683.

< Redaction Request due 6/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017. (Breiter, Lisa) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 5/16/2017. Defendant's motions to dismiss #105 , #108 and #114 , and Plaintiff's motion to strike reply #132 are taken under advisement. Any motion for leave to file under seal a proposed third amended complaint (with an attached draft of any such complaint) is granted. The motion to amend shall be filed under seal on or before 5/30/2017; responses to the motion to amend shall be filed on or before 6/13/2017; replies will not be permitted absent leave of court. The Court will rule on the request to file a third amended complaint, and all other pending motions, by separate order, and set any additional case management dates, if needed. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 135 RESPONSE by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylorin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to strike reply #125 Exhibits of Seyfarth Shaw, LLP's and Graham Taylor's Reply on Motion to Dismiss #132 (Klein, Keith) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion to strike reply #132 is entered and continued, and will be taken up with the motions to dismiss. The 4/13/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The motion hearing previously set for 5/16/17 stands. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 6, 2017 Filing 133 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief #132 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/13/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 6, 2017 Filing 132 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to strike reply #125 Exhibits of Seyfarth Shaw, LLP's and Graham Taylor's Reply on Motion to Dismiss (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 131 SEALED REPLY by Northern Trust Corporation to reply #128 , MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Amended Complaint #108 SEALED Northern Trust Corporations Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 130 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Northern Trust's motion for leave to file its reply under seal #126 is granted. The 4/6/17 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 129 REPLY by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #105 (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 128 REPLY by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to notice of motion, #127 , motion to dismiss #108 [REDACTED] NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 127 Northern Trust Corporations Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Northern Trust Corporations Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion to seal document #126 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/6/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 126 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to seal document MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL NORTHERN TRUST CORPORATIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 125 REPLY by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor to motion to dismiss #114 plaintiff's amended complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss #122 is granted. Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before 3/30/2017. Motion hearing previously set for 3/21/2017 is stricken. Status hearing set for 5/16/2017, to stand. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 10, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #122 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/21/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 10, 2017 Filing 122 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss #108 (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 121 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #105 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 120 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Amended Complaint #108 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 119 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Graham Taylor, Seyfarth Shaw LLP to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint #114 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 3, 2017 Filing 118 EXHIBITS included in Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss amended complaint for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim. (mc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 3, 2017 Filing 117 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Briefing on Defendants' motions to dismiss #105 , #108 , #114 is set as follows: Plaintiff shall file his responses by 3/2/17, and Defendants shall file their replies by 3/16/17. Northern Trust Corporation's motion for leave to file under seal #109 is granted. The 2/14/17 Notice of Motion dates are stricken, and the parties need not appear. Additionally, the status hearing previously set for 2/14/17 is stricken and reset to 5/16/17 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Gehringer for presentment of motion to dismiss #114 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/14/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor in support of motion to dismiss #114 plaintiff's amended complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION by Defendants Graham Taylor, Seyfarth Shaw LLP to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion to dismiss #108 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/14/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion to seal document #109 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/9/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 111 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM by Northern Trust Corporation in support of motion to dismiss #108 REDACTED (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 109 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to seal document Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 108 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to dismiss Amended Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE of Motion by Amy Yongmee Cho for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #105 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/14/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM by Christiana Bank & Trust Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #105 (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 2, 2017 Filing 105 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 19, 2017 Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #102 is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 2/2/2017. Status hearing previously set for 2/1/2017 is reset for 2/14/2017 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 18, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief #102 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/24/2017 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 18, 2017 Filing 102 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #101 or Otherwise Plead (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 23, 2016 Filing 101 AMENDED complaint by Steven Menzies against All Defendants (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 14, 2016 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 12/14/2016. Any amended complaint shall be filed on or before 12/23/2016. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 1/26/2017. Status hearing set for 2/1/2017 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/15/16 before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Court Reporter Contact Information: Lisa H. Breiter lisa_breiter@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 818-6683. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2017. (Breiter, Lisa) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 11/15/2016. Plaintiff's motions to compel #72 , 75 and 78 are granted in part and denied in part as stated in open court. Status hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 10, 2016 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file memoranda and certain exhibits under seal #94 is granted. The 11/15/16 Notice of Motion date is stricken, though the 11/15/16 status hearing date stands. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Northern Trust Corporation's motion for leave to file certain documents under seal #83 is granted. The 11/15/16 Notice of Motion date is stricken, though the 11/15/16 status hearing date stands. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Aaron Dorfman for presentment of motion for leave to file #94 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/15/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Memoranda In Support of His Motions to Compel and Certain Confidential Exhibits Under Seal (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 93 SEALED REPLY by Steven Menzies to response in opposition to motion, #85 Menzies Reply to Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L)(Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 92 REPLY by Steven Menzies to response in opposition to motion, #85 Menzies Reply to Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L)(Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 91 SEALED REPLY by Steven Menzies to response to motion, #82 Menzies Reply to Seyfarth Shaw's and Graham Taylor's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 90 REPLY by Steven Menzies to response to motion, #82 Menzies Reply to Seyfarth Shaw's and Graham Taylor's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 89 SEALED REPLY by Steven Menzies to sealed response,, 87 Menzies Reply to Northern Trust's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 8, 2016 Filing 88 REPLY by Steven Menzies to Response, #86 Menzies Reply to Northern Trust's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 2, 2016 Filing 87 SEALED RESPONSE by Northern Trust Corporation to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Northern Trust Corp.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories #70 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Northern Trust Corp.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories #72 , memorandum in support of motion #71 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 86 RESPONSE by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to motion to compel #70 , Sealed motion, #72 , memorandum in support of motion #71 [Redacted] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 [Redacted], #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 85 RESPONSE by Christiana Bank & Trust Companyin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories #73 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories 75 (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of motion to seal #83 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/15/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to seal Northern Trust's Response with Exhibit to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 82 RESPONSE by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor to MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Seyfarth Shaw LLP's and Graham Taylor's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories #76 (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 19, 2016 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file memoranda under seal #79 is granted, and Plaintiff is given leave to file his memoranda in support of his motions to compel and Exhibits E, F, G, N, O, Q, R, S under seal. The 10/27/16 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 11/15/16 status hearing date stands. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey B. Charkow for presentment of motion for leave to file #79 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/27/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for leave to file Memoranda In Support of His Motions to Compel and Certain Confidential Exhibits Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 78 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Seyfarth Shaw LLP's and Graham Taylor's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM by Steven Menzies in support of motion to compel, #76 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Seyfarth Shaw LLP's and Graham Taylor's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 75 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by Steven Menzies in support of motion to compel #73 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Christiana Bank & Trust Co.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 72 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Northern Trust Corp.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit A , #3 Exhibit B , #4 Exhibit C , #5 Exhibit D , # 6 Exhibit E )(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM by Steven Menzies in support of motion to compel #70 [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 70 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies to compel Northern Trust Corp.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 17, 2016 Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company by Peter Francis O'neill (O'neill, Peter) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 10/11/2016. Any motion to compel shall be filed on or before 10/18/2016: response shall be filed on or before 11/1/2016; reply shall be filed on or before 11/8/2016. Status hearing set for 11/15/2016 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 28, 2016 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 9/28/2016 and continued to 10/11/2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Parties should meet and confer regarding discovery and be prepared to set a briefing schedule on any motion to compel at the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 11, 2016 Filing 66 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/11/2016. Mailed notice(gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 11, 2016 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order #63 is granted. Enter Agreed Confidentiality Order. The 8/18/16 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 10, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Aaron Dorfman for presentment of motion for protective order #63 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/18/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 10, 2016 Filing 63 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Menzies for protective order (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 26, 2016 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 7/26/2016 and continued to 9/28/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Discovery stay is hereby lifted. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 22, 2016 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion to withdraw the appearance of Josephine Tung #59 is granted. Motion hearing set for 7/28/2016, is stricken, however, the status set for 7/26/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725, stands. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Keith G. Klein for presentment of motion to withdraw #59 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/28/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Klein, Keith) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor to withdraw the appearance of Josephine Tung (Klein, Keith) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor by Keith G. Klein (Klein, Keith) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/15/2016. Mailed notice(gel, ) (Main Document 57 replaced on 7/18/2016) (gel, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
July 15, 2016 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Pursuant to the minute order dated 3/30/2016 #55 , Defendant's motion to dismiss #29 , #31 and #35 are granted in part and denied in part. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Status hearing set for 7/26/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
March 30, 2016 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Defendants' motions to dismiss #29 , #31 , and #35 are granted in part and in denied in part. The Court will issue it full opinion, and set other case management dates as needed, by separate written order. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion to withdraw appearance of Daniel M. Hinkle #53 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION by Attorney Daniel M. Hinkle to withdraw as attorney for Christiana Bank & Trust Company. No party information provided (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 28, 2016 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 1/28/2016. Defendants' motions to dismiss #29 , #31 , #35 are taken under advisement, and the Court will rule by mail. Additional case management dates will be set, as needed, in a separate order. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
January 25, 2016 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the motion hearing previously set for 1/28/2016 at 9:45 a.m. is reset for 1/28/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 9, 2015 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Agreed oral motion to reset motion hearing date is granted. The motion hearing previously set for 1/26/2016 is reset for 1/28/2016 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the 12/15/15 status hearing is stricken and reset for motion hearing on 1/26/16 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. The parties shall come to the motion hearing prepared to argue all fully briefed motions pending in the case. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
November 5, 2015 Filing 48 WITHDRAWING Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Same Firm as counsel for Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company and substituting Gary Michael Elden as counsel of record (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
October 9, 2015 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the 10/14/15 status hearing is stricken and reset to 12/15/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 15, 2015 Filing 46 REPLY by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #35 (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 15, 2015 Filing 45 REPLY by Defendants Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor to motion to dismiss #31 , memorandum in support of motion #32 (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
September 15, 2015 Filing 44 REPLY by Christiana Bank & Trust Company to response in opposition to motion #42 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #29 (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 43 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMNorthern Trust Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint #35 (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 42 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #29 (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
August 14, 2015 Filing 41 RESPONSE by Steven Menziesin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Graham Taylor, Seyfarth Shaw LLP to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #31 (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 24, 2015 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion and status hearing held on 6/24/2015. Oral motion by Parties to stay discovery pending resolution of the pending motions to dismiss #29 #31 #35 is granted. Responses to the pending motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before 8/14/2015; replies shall be filed on or before 9/15/2015. Motion hearing regarding defendant's motions to dismiss #29 #31 #35 is set for 10/14/2015 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 18, 2015 Filing 39 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Steven Menzies (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 38 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Seyfarth Shaw LLP (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #35 by Northern Trust Corporation Memorandum of Law in Support of Northern Trust Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #35 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/24/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMNorthern Trust Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 34 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Northern Trust Corporation (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Gehringer for presentment of motion to dismiss #31 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/24/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor in support of motion to dismiss #31 Plaintiff's Complaint (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendants Graham Taylor, Seyfarth Shaw LLP to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Gary Michael Elden for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #29 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/24/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DEFENDANT CHRISTIANA BANK & TRUST COMPANY'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #3 Exhibit Ex. C to Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #4 Exhibit Ex. D to Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #5 Exhibit Ex. E to Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim)(Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 27 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Christiana Bank & Trust Company CHRISTIANA BANK & TRUST COMPANY'S FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND L.R. 3.2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 2, 2015 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seyfarth Shaw LLP by Josephine Tung (Tung, Josephine) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 1, 2015 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Graham Taylor by Josephine Tung (Tung, Josephine) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 1, 2015 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Graham Taylor by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
June 1, 2015 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Graham Taylor by Matthew J. Gehringer (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 28, 2015 Filing 22 WITHDRAWING Katherine A. Neville as counsel for Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company and substituting Gary Michael Elden as counsel of record (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 28, 2015 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company by Amy Yongmee Cho (Cho, Amy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 22, 2015 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company by Daniel M Hinkle (Hinkle, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 11, 2015 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company's agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #17 is granted. Defendant Christiana's answer (or other responsive pleading) is now due 6/10/15. The 5/14/15 Notice of Motion date is stricken; the parties need not appear. The 6/24/15 initial status conference date stands; the parties are reminded that their initial status report is due no later than 6/18/15. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 8, 2015 Filing 18 Notice of Agreed Motion NOTICE of Motion by Katherine Anne Neville for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #17 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/14/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Neville, Katherine) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 8, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company for extension of time to file answer Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Christiana Bank & Trust Company to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Neville, Katherine) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 8, 2015 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company by Katherine Anne Neville (Neville, Katherine) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 8, 2015 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Christiana Bank & Trust Company by Gary Michael Elden (Elden, Gary) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 5, 2015 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The agreed motions for extension of time filed by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation #7 and Defendant Seyfarth Shaw LLP #11 are granted. Those Defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings on or before 6/10/2015. The notice of motion date of 5/7/15 is stricken, and the parties need not appear at that time. The initial status conference remains set for 6/24/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 4, 2015 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seyfarth Shaw LLP by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 4, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Gehringer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/7/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 4, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Seyfarth Shaw LLP for extension of time to file answer (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 4, 2015 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seyfarth Shaw LLP by Matthew J. Gehringer (Gehringer, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northern Trust Corporation by H. Nicholas Berberian (Berberian, H.) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle David Rettberg for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/7/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Northern Trust Corporation for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northern Trust Corporation by Kyle David Rettberg (Rettberg, Kyle) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 28, 2015 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The case is set for an initial status conference 6/24/15 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1725. The parties are advised to review and strictly comply with the Court's standing order concerning initial status conferences and the filing of the initial status report (which, in this case, will be due no later than 6/18/15). The standing order and the template for the initial status report are available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (gel, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Menzies by Jeffrey B. Charkow (Charkow, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Menzies by Daniel Aaron Dorfman (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven Menzies; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10552185.(Dorfman, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 17, 2015 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]
April 17, 2015 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Christiana Bank & Trust Company, Northern Trust Corporation, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Graham Taylor (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menzies v. Seyfarth Shaw LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seyfarth Shaw LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Trust Corporation
Represented By: Kyle D. Rettberg
Represented By: Renee Mosley Delcollo
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Represented By: Richard Philip Rollo
Represented By: H. Nicholas Berberian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: William Edward Gamgort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Menzies
Represented By: Daniel Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?