Bayer Pharma AG et al v. Lupin Limited et al
Plaintiff: Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer AG and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00314
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson, Dov P. Grossman, Alexander S. Zolan, Kathryn S. Kayali, and Julie L. Tavares, filed by Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer AG, and #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney S. Isaac Olson, filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/16/2021. (nms)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney S. Isaac Olson - filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce R. Genderson, Dov P. Grossman, Alexander S. Zolan, Kathryn S. Kayali, and Julie L. Tavares - filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (Fahnestock, Derek)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C. Haney on behalf of Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Haney, Megan)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance A. Soderstrom, Deepro Mukerjee, Guylaine Hache and Jillian M. Schurr, filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/8/2021. (nms)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lance A. Soderstrom, Deepro Mukerjee, Guylaine Hache and Jillian M. Schurr - filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lance A. Soderstrom, #2 Certification of Deepro Mukerjee, #3 Certification of Guylaine Hache, #4 Certification of Jillian M. Schurr)(Phillips, John)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG: For Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Fahnestock, Derek)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG: For Lupin Limited waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Fahnestock, Derek)
March 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (amf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Pharma AG - filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (amf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 1/29/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: 1/31/2039. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: N/A* (*U.S. Patent No. 7,157,456 expires August 28, 2024.) (amf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,828,310 B2. (amf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3554685.) - filed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer Pharma AG et al v. Lupin Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Pharma AG
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer AG
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?