Corso v. Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Corso
Defendant: Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00353
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Stephanos Bibas
Referring Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 USCA Order It is hereby ORDERED that the above matter is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A certified copy of this order is issued in lieu of a formal mandate. (tm, )
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION of Dismissal //Stipulated Dismissal by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #73 Judgment,,, Terminated Case,, //Satisfaction of Judgment Dated April 13, 2023 by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORAL ORDER, I STAY all deadlines and motions practice in this case while the parties finalize their settlement. The parties SHALL file a joint status report on June 16, 2023, if the settlement is not final by then. Ordered by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 5/19/2023. (mpb)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REDACTED VERSION of #79 Reply Brief by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tiana A. Bey, #2 Second Declaration of Kevin S. Mann)(Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #74 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tiana A. Bey, #2 Second Declaration of Kevin S. Mann, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2023. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re #76 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Joseph Corso. USCA Case Number 23-1867. USCA Case Manager: Tim McIntyre (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (tm, )
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEAL of #73 Judgment,,, Terminated Case,, . Appeal filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment received re #76 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Joseph Corso. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number ADEDC-4132544.) (Mann, Kevin)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #74 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Joseph Corso.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Gordon, #2 Declaration of Douglas Gold, #3 Declaration of Kevin S. Mann)(Mann, Kevin)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Attorney Fees - filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Kevin)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINAL JUDGMENT, I ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant on the Complaint's (D.I. #1 ) breach-of-contract cause of action for interest payments due in 2018, 2019, and 2020, in the amount of $831,916.85. I ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on all other parts of the Complaint. Post-judgment interest SHALL ACCRUE from the date of this Judgment at an annually compounding rate of 4.53%. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 4/13/2023. (twk)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 4/13/2023. (twk)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORAL ORDER, I DISMISS Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and costs (D.I. #69 ) as premature under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d) and District of Delaware Local Rule 54.1(a)(1). Plaintiff may re-file the motion for attorneys' fees within 14 days after entry of final judgment, and he may re-file the motion for costs within 14 days after the time for appeal has expired or within 14 days after the issuance of the mandate of the appellate court. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 4/13/2023. (twk)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #69 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Joseph Corso.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Gordon, #2 Declaration of Douglas Gold, #3 Declaration of Kevin S. Mann)(Mann, Kevin)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Attorney Fees - filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Kevin)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Letter to The Honorable Stephanos Bibas from Kevin S. Mann, Esq. regarding Prejudgment Interest - re #66 Order,,,. (Mann, Kevin)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Letter to Judge Stephanos Bibas from Alessandra Glorioso regarding Prejudgment Interest. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER, I GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (D.I. #45 ). I grant his claims for interest payments in 2018, 2019, and 2020, totaling $669,600, but deny the motion in all other respects. I GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART Defendant's motion for summary judgment (D.I. #38 ). I grant summary judgment dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims for principal payments, interest payments accruing before 2018, prevention, and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, but deny the motion in all other respects. I DISMISS AS MOOT Plaintiff's motion in limine (D.I. #39 ). Within 14 days of the date of this Order, the parties SHALL submit simultaneous letter briefs, not to exceed three single-spaced pages, on the issue of prejudgment interest, including proposed calculations. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 3/24/2023. (twk)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 3/24/2023. (twk)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Oral Order: I POSTPONE the pretrial conference and trial. If necessary, I will set new dates after I resolve the pending motion for summary judgment. D.I. #45 . Ordered by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 08/25/2022. (smg)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REDACTED VERSION of #61 Appendix by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REDACTED VERSION of #60 Reply Brief by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #60 Reply Brief //Appendix to Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment //Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REDACTED VERSION of #54 Appendix by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REDACTED VERSION of #53 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #39 MOTION in Limine //Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Philip Green Under Daubert filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #53 Answering Brief in Opposition, //Appendix to Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgmen by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment //Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Corso.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REDACTED VERSION Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REDACTED VERSION of #47 Appendix by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Oral Order: I GRANT Defendant's request to exceed the page limit by two pages. D.I. #40 . Any future requests must include a more specific explanation. And they must be granted before the party files an over-length brief. Otherwise, I will strike any excess pages. Ordered by Judge Stephanos Bibas on 05/25/2022. (smg)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REDACTED VERSION of #44 Appendix, by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REDACTED VERSION of #42 Opening Brief in Support, by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #46 Opening Brief in Support //Appendix to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Corso.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #42 Opening Brief in Support, //Appendix to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Philip Green Under Daubert by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 APPENDIX re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #39 MOTION in Limine //Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Philip Green Under Daubert filed by Joseph Corso.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2022. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION in Limine //Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Philip Green Under Daubert - filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Paula Richmond in Response to Report of Philip Green filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Report of Philip Green and Defendant's Supplemental Document Production Labeled DEF 11475 filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..(Glorioso, Alessandra)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Stephanos Bibas of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 3/14/2022. (rjb)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Stephanos Bibas, of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (SB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Paula S. Richmond filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Corso on January 25, 2022 filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..(Glorioso, Alessandra)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SO ORDERED, re #31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND Scheduling Order Dates Including Trial filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. -- Discovery due by 1/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2022. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/2/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 9/12/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/4/22. (ntl)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Scheduling Order Dates Including Trial to September 12, 2022 - filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Corso on December 16, 2021 filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..(Glorioso, Alessandra)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tiana A. Bey for Joseph Corso added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Subpoena by Joseph Corso (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mann, Kevin)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tiana A. Bey, Esq. - filed by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tiana A. Bey, Esq. filed by Joseph Corso. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/16/21. (ntl)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Supplemental Answers to Pleaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Defedant's Answers to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Defendant's Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Request for Production of Documents filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..(Glorioso, Alessandra)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Concordia Pharmaceuticals (US), Inc. (formerly known as Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.) on 11/9/21 filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..(Glorioso, Alessandra)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. See ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/1/2021. (Taylor, Daniel)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant and Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference re: Mediation is set for 8/27/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. See ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/2021. (Taylor, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Joseph Corso and Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Joseph Corso filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..(Glorioso, Alessandra)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Service for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production of Documents by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Service for Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/9/2021. (etg)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order - filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 12/31/2021. Status Report due by 12/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2022. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/29/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 8/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/30/21. (ntl)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (Taylor, Daniel)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Alessandra Glorioso regarding [Proposed] Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glorioso, Alessandra)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant filed by Joseph Corso.(Mann, Kevin)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Advanz Pharma Corp. Limited for Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Angela E. Dralle for Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David B. Gordon for Joseph Corso added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Gordon - filed by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angela E. Dralle filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc., #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William J. Miller filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/4/21. (ntl)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Gordon filed by Joseph Corso. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/4/21. (ntl)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney William J. Miller for Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William J. Miller - filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angela E. Dralle - filed by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc..(Glorioso, Alessandra)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer Complaint to 5/3/2021 filed by Joseph Corso. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/27/21. (ntl)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer Complaint to 5/3/2021 - filed by Joseph Corso. (Mann, Kevin)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Corso. Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Mann, Kevin)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3566705.) - filed by Joseph Corso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corso v. Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concordia Healthcare USA, Inc.
Represented By: Alessandra Glorioso
Represented By: William J. Miller
Represented By: Angela E. Dralle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Corso
Represented By: Kevin Scott Mann
Represented By: David B. Gordon
Represented By: Tiana A. Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?