Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund et al v. MEP Nationwide, LLC
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund and Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund
Defendant: MEP Nationwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00503
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Default as to MEP Nationwide, LLC - filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Curtis J. Crowther, #2 Certificate of Service)(Crowther, Curtis)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund. MEP Nationwide, LLC served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Crowther, Curtis)
April 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 7, 2021 No Summons Issued. (mal)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against MEP Nationwide, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3587070.) - filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund, Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund, Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund et al v. MEP Nationwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Pension Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Educational/PAC Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union #74 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union NO. 74 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Curtis J. Crowther
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEP Nationwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?