Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Lupin Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00530
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 24, 2021 filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Ltd. answer due 6/24/2021; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 6/24/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/7/2021. (fms)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 24, 2021 - filed by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to June 10, 2021 filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Ltd. answer due 6/10/2021; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 6/10/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/5/2021. (fms)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to respond to the Complaint to June 10, 2021 - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Dellinger, Megan)
April 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Dellinger, Megan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. Lupin Ltd. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Dellinger, Megan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent C.H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. KG. for Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.(apk)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,551,957 B2 ;9,155,705 B2 ;9,415,016 B2 ;9,949,998 B2 ;10,022,379 B2 ;10,258,637 B2 ;10,406,172 B2. (apk)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 3/4/2021. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ANDA FORM.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/4/2023. (apk)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3592448.) - filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Lupin Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?