Bowe v. Saul et al
Plaintiff: Tyraa P.S. Bowe
Defendant: Steven L. Butler and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00569
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Administrative Law Judge Steven L. Butler on 5/21/2021, filed by Tyraa P.S. Bowe. (kmd)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Commissioner Andrew Saul on 5/21/2021, filed by Tyraa P.S. Bowe. (kmd)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/12/2021. (nmf)
April 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (nmg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 [SEALED] Medical Records re #1 Complaint filed by Tyraa P.S. Bowe. (nmg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Steven L. Butler and Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number DEX035546.) - filed by Tyraa P.S. Bowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #6 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowe v. Saul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyraa P.S. Bowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?