Butts, et al. v. Boone Logistics Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Lafondra Butts and Adrian Jones
Defendant: Boone Logistics Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00581
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas filed by Lafondra Butts, Adrian Jones.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warner, Raeann)
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Boone Logistics Services, LLC.(Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 6/21/2021 (nms).
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Miller, Esq. - filed by Lafondra Butts, Adrian Jones. (Warner, Raeann)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Miller, Esq., filed by Lafondra Butts, Adrian Jones. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2021. (nms)
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 7.1.1 STATEMENT re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. (Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 6/4/2021 (nms).
June 4, 2021 Filing 14 FIRST Amended Individual and Collective Action Complaint against Boone Logistics Services, LLC - filed by Lafondra Butts. (Attachments: #1 Red-Lined version)(Gallagher, Patrick) Modified on 6/4/2021 (nms).
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support, by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. (Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 6/4/2021 (nms).
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/18/2021. (Houseal, Timothy)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas - filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 6/4/2021 (nms).
June 4, 2021 LOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI #11 . Please file the averment using the event code STATEMENT, found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. (nms)
June 4, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lennon B. Haas for Boone Logistics Services, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
June 3, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brett C. Bartlett for Boone Logistics Services, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
June 3, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin Young for Boone Logistics Services, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Young - filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. (Houseal, Timothy)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lennon B. Haas - filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. (Houseal, Timothy)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brett C. Bartlett - filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. (Houseal, Timothy)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin Young, filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/24/2021. (nms)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brett C. Bartlett, filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/24/2021. (nms)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lennon B. Haas, filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/24/2021. (nms)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/4/2021. (Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 5/21/2021 (nms).
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Boone Logistics Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Houseal, Timothy) Modified on 5/21/2021 (nms).
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lafondra Butts, Adrian Jones. Defendant Boone Logistics Services, LLC served on 4/30/2021. Answer due 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Warner, Raeann) Modified on 5/5/2021 (nms).
April 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party Plaintiff Consent Form, by Adrian Jones. (Warner, Raeann) Modified on 4/28/2021 (nms). Modified on 4/28/2021 (nms).
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Boone Logistics Services, LLC - (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3601841) - filed by Lafondra Butts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) Modified on 4/28/2021 (nms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butts, et al. v. Boone Logistics Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone Logistics Services, LLC
Represented By: Brett C. Bartlett
Represented By: Lennon B. Haas
Represented By: Kevin Young
Represented By: Timothy Jay Houseal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafondra Butts
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Jones
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?