Hansen et al v. Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terri Hansen and Beverly Shinnen
Defendant: Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00649
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Defendant's reply to August 16, 2021 and August 30, 2021 filed by Terri Hansen. Set Briefing Schedule: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Answering Brief due 8/16/2021., Reply Brief due 8/30/2021.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/1/2021. (fms)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Defendant's reply to August 16, 2021 and August 30, 2021 - filed by Terri Hansen. (Minuti, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/6/2021. (Sabesan, Roopa)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sabesan, Roopa)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Response to Complaint to June 21, 2021 filed by Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. answer due 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/10/2021. (fms)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Response to Complaint to June 21, 2021 - filed by Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Sabesan, Roopa)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Time to Respond to the Complaint to June 11, 2021 filed by Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc. answer due 6/11/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/12/2021. (nmf)
May 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Time to Respond to the Complaint to June 11, 2021 - filed by Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Sabesan, Roopa)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N21C-03-235 (CEB) (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3608644)- filed by Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen et al v. Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Hansen
Represented By: Michael Patrick Minuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Shinnen
Represented By: Michael Patrick Minuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandywine Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Milewski
Represented By: Roopa Sabesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?