Estate of Jack Carmel v. The GIII Accumulation Trust
Plaintiff: Estate of Jack Carmel
Defendant: The GIII Accumulation Trust and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary
Case Number: 1:2021cv00658
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, #12 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary to Answer Amended Complaint. (*Reset Answer Deadline: Answer due 7/23/2021). ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 6/21/2021. (ceg)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary to Answer Amended Complaint to July 23, 2021 - filed by The GIII Accumulation Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary. (Caponi, Steven)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Gloria McGregor for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 05/28/2021, filed by Estate of Jack Carmel. (Gouge, Donald)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons and Complaint Rescinded as to The GIII Accumulation Trust by Estate of Jack Carmel (apk)
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Estate of Jack Carmel: For The GIII Accumulation Trust waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Gouge, Donald)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Estate of Jack Carmel: For The GIII Accumulation Trust waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Gouge, Donald)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Estate of Jack Carmel.(Gouge, Donald)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Immediate Discovery. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/17/2021. (ceg)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery Immediate, limited discovery - filed by Estate of Jack Carmel. Motions referred to Jennifer L. Hall.(Gouge, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2021: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ceg).
May 14, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: An exhibit and proposed order have been added to D.I. #5 . The documents were inadvertently omitted at the initial time of filing. (ceg)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 21-658-MN-JLH. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/13/2021. (dlw)
May 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against The GIII Accumulation Trust - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3609775.) - filed by Estate of Jack Carmel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jack Carmel v. The GIII Accumulation Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jack Carmel
Represented By: Donald L. Gouge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GIII Accumulation Trust
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Securities Intermediary
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?