Green v. Connections Community Support Programs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charlene Green
Defendant: Dana Metzger, Herman M. Ellis, Marc Richman and Connections Community Support Programs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00660
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. numbers #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 and #14 . (lih)
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay - filed by Charlene Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Hampton, Stephen) Modified on 6/28/2021 (lih).
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Herman M. Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rowe, Kelly)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dana Metzger, Marc Richman. (Song, Rebecca)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Charlene Green.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hampton, Stephen)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Charlene Green.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hampton, Stephen)
May 26, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with filer, docket clerk has deleted the documents previously filed as D.I. numbers 10 through 13. Documents will be re-filed using the appropriate event code. (lih)
May 26, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 10 has been deleted per the request of the filer. Document will be re-filed. (lih)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service RE: Sealed Letter to the Honorable Maryellen Noreika referencing Plaintiffs Expert filed by Charlene Green.(Hampton, Stephen)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case, including the pending motions to dismiss, are referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 21-660-MN-SRF. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/13/2021. Motions #3 , #5 referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(dlw)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Stephen A. Hampton, Esq. regarding Plaintiffs Expert on Behalf of the Above-Captioned Case. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Expert CV, #2 Plaintiffs Expert Signed Affidavit)(Hampton, Stephen)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Herman M. Ellis.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/26/2021. (Rowe, Kelly)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Herman M. Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rowe, Kelly)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dana Metzger, Marc Richman.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/26/2021. (Song, Rebecca)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Dana Metzger, Marc Richman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Song, Rebecca)
May 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of Delaware for Kent County, Case Number K21C-03-034 JJC (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3609925)- filed by Dana Metzger, Marc Richman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Connections Community Support Programs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Metzger
Represented By: Rebecca Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman M. Ellis
Represented By: Dana Spring Monzo
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Richman
Represented By: Rebecca Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connections Community Support Programs, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Olivere
Represented By: Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Represented By: William E. Chipman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Green
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?