Wu et al v. East Ocean Agriculture Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Xinbin Tian, Xiuju Deng, Chunyang Cai, Cuimin Tian, Ji Guo Wu, Zhen Lei, Suhong Yang and Shouhuai Yang
Defendant: East Ocean Agriculture Corp. and Xiandong Shi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00668
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on East Ocean Agriculture Corp. on 6/2/21, filed by Chunyang Cai, Xiuju Deng, Zhen Lei, Cuimin Tian, Xinbin Tian, Ji Guo Wu, Shouhuai Yang, Suhong Yang. (Garibian, Antranig)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Xiandong Shi on 5/27/21, filed by Zhen Lei, Cuimin Tian, Xinbin Tian, Ji Guo Wu, Shouhuai Yang, Suhong Yang. (Garibian, Antranig)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heng Wang, filed by Cuimin Tian, Ji Guo Wu, Zhen Lei, Suhong Yang, Xiuju Deng, Shouhuai Yang, Xinbin Tian, Chunyang Cai. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/12/2021. (nms)
May 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heng Wang - filed by Chunyang Cai, Xiuju Deng, Zhen Lei, Cuimin Tian, Xinbin Tian, Ji Guo Wu, Shouhuai Yang, Suhong Yang. (Garibian, Antranig)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against East Ocean Agriculture Corp., Xiandong Shi - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3610792.) - filed by Suhong Yang, Shouhuai Yang, Chunyang Cai, Cuimin Tian, Xinbin Tian, Ji Guo Wu, Zhen Lei, Xiuju Deng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
May 7, 2021 No Summons Issued. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu et al v. East Ocean Agriculture Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xinbin Tian
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiuju Deng
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chunyang Cai
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuimin Tian
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ji Guo Wu
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhen Lei
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suhong Yang
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shouhuai Yang
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Ocean Agriculture Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiandong Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?