Harris v. Centurion et al
Plaintiff: Eric Harris
Defendant: Delaware Department of Correction, William Ngwa, The City of Wilmington, Delaware, Jasvir Kavr, Claire DeMatteis, Centurion, Connections CSP and Delaware Health & Social Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv00739
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter to Eric Harris, from the Clerk of Court, regarding authorization form and enclosing a copy of the docket sheet. (smg) Modified on 7/7/2021 (nms).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter to the Clerk of Court, from Eric Harris, dated 7/02/2021, regarding authorization form and service. (smg) Modified on 7/7/2021 (nms).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Compel, filed by Eric Harris. (kmd)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Authorization by Eric Harris requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (smg)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Centurion, Connections CSP, Claire DeMatteis, Delaware Department of Correction, Jasvir Kavr, William Ngwa, The City of Wilmington, Delaware, and adding Delaware Health & Social Services- filed by Eric Harris.(smg)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $11.44 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice (Copy to pltf.)(Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/2/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Authorization) (nms)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION Requesting Money be Placed in Escrow - filed by Eric Harris. (myr) Modified on 6/2/2021 (nms).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Eric Harris. (myr)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Compel - filed by Eric Harris. (myr)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Centurion, Connections CSP, Claire DeMatteis, Delaware Department of Correction, Jasvir Kavr, William Ngwa, The City of Wilmington, Delaware (IFP Provided, No Fee Paid)- filed by Eric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(myr)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric Harris (myr)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Eric Harris. (myr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Centurion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ngwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Wilmington, Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasvir Kavr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire DeMatteis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connections CSP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Health & Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?