Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A et al v. MSN Laboratories Private Limited et al
Plaintiff: Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC and Zambon S.p.A.
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Zenara Pharma Private Limited, RK Pharma, Inc., Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd and Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Case Number: 1:2021cv00843
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bonnie Fletcher Price for MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION for Fish & Richardson P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Status Conference scheduled for October 6, 2023 is RESCHEDULED for October 5, 2023 at 9:00 AM. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 6/14/23. (ntl)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Notice of Deposition to Allen Reitz filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #268 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bonnie Fletcher Price filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 6/8/23. (ntl)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bonnie Fletcher Price - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Farnan, Michael)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation of Elizabeth Flanagan by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A. (Farnan, Michael)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Farnan on behalf of MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A. (Farnan, Michael)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A. (Farnan, Brian)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Notice of Deposition to John Timothy Greenamyre filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ngoc Ngo on June 29, 2023 filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., RK Pharma, Inc., Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Dorsney, Kenneth)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michele Tagliati on June 26, 2023 filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Delcollo, Renee)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants RK Pharma and Prinston's Reply Expert Report of Ron Bihovsky regarding Invalidity and Related Document Production filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Samuel Pleasure, M.D., Ph.D. filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Reply Expert Report of Allen B. Reitz, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement of the '485 and '515 Patents by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Reply Expert Report of Michele Tagliati, M.D. Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,283,380 filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Booker, Gregory)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Deposition of Peter LeWitt, M.D. filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Samuel Pleasure and Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Ronald Bihovsky filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of #251 Stipulation, and [Proposed Order] Regarding Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Limited's Infringement of the Asserted '515 and '485 Patents by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report of Peter LeWitt, M.D., on the Noninfringement of the '380 Patent by Defendants Prinston, RK Pharma, and Zenara filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Delcollo, Renee)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #253 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Redactions to D.I. 251 to May 2, 2023 filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/2/23. (ntl)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report of Ron Bihovsky, Ph.D. on Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,076,515 and 8,278,485 by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Redactions to D.I. 251 to May 2, 2023 - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Booker, Gregory)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Confidential Expert Report of Ngoc Ngo on Commercial Success; Rebuttal Expert Report of John Timothy Greenamyre to MSN Laboratories Private Limited; Confidential Rebuttal Expert Report of Allen Reitz, and Rebuttal Expert Report of John Timothy Greenamyre to Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Confidential Rebuttal Expert Report of Allen Reitz, and Rebuttal Expert Report of John Timothy Greenamyre to RK Pharma Inc.; Rebuttal Expert Report of John Timothy Greenamyre to Zenara Pharma Private Limited filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #251 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Limited's Infringement of the Asserted '515 and '485 Patents filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/25/23. (ntl)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 [SEALED] STIPULATION Regarding Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Limited's Infringement of the Asserted '515 and '485 Patents by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER re #249 Memorandum Opinion regarding claim construction. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/14/23. (ntl)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/14/23. (ntl)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants RK Pharma and Prinston's Opening Expert Report of Ron Bihovsky regarding Invalidity and Related Document Production filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Confidential Opening Expert Report of Michele Tagliati, Confidential Opening Expert Report of Allen Reitz to MSN Laboratories Private Limited; (2) Confidential Opening Expert Report of Michele Tagliati, Confidential Opening Expert Report of Allen Reitz to Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.; (3) Confidential Opening Expert Report of Michele Tagliati, Confidential Opening Expert Report of Allen Reitz to RK Pharma Inc.; (4) Confidential Opening Expert Report of Michele Tagliati, Confidential Opening Expert Report of Allen Reitz to Zenara Pharma Private Limited filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORAL ORDER: Counsel having indicated by letter (D.I. 245) that a discovery teleconference is no longer needed, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for March 28, 2023 is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/27/23. (ntl)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Letter to Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Nitika Gupta Fiorella and Carl D. Neff regarding the discovery conference scheduled for March 28, 2023 is no longer required - re 244 Order Setting Teleconference,,,. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a thirty (30) minute discovery teleconference will be held on Tuesday, March 28 at 3:00 p.m. The parties shall arrange for the teleconference and shall provide chambers with the call-in information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not later than Tuesday, March 21, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than Friday, March 24, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/7/23. (ntl)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #243 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Complete Depositions of Defendant MSN to March 17, 2023 filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A., #242 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Completion of Discovery to March 10, 2023 filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/3/23. (ntl)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Complete Depositions of Defendant MSN to March 17, 2023 - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 242 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Completion of Discovery to March 10, 2023 - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Confidential Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Confidential Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 6) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Letter to Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Nitika Gupta Fiorella and Carl D. Neff regarding Scheduling of Discovery Teleconference. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Amended Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Admission to Prinston (Nos. 13-19) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 2) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Sonal Jagani, Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Raghu Kasu, and Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Ravishanker Kovi filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Confidential Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1 and 3) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Initial Disclosures to MSN Laboratories Private Limited; Plaintiffs' Third Amended Initial Disclosures to Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Plaintiffs' Third Amended Initial Disclosures to RK Pharma Inc., and Plaintiffs' Third Amended Initial Disclosures to Zenara Pharma Private Limited filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 7-10) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Mahaboob Dowla, Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Praveen Kumar, and Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Deposition of Bhaskar Reddy filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN's Privilege Log filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma, Inc.'s Privilege Log filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A.'s Privilege Log, Zambon S.p.A.'s Privilege Log, and MDD US Operations, LLC Privilege Log filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RK Pharma's response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-7) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN's Responses & Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Request for Admission to Prinston (Nos. 13-19) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Individual Interrogatories (Nos. 1-2), Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-7), and Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 6 and 7) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Production; (2) Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Delcollo, Renee)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.s Revised Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 7 filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Dr. Jayaraman Kannapan filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 12) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #215 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A. -- Party Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. terminated. Attorney R. Touhey Myer; Michael P. Hogan and Timothy H. Kratz terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/5/23. (ntl)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 215 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of MSN Laboratories Private Limited filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Booker, Gregory)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition of Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.; Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition to Zenara Pharma Private Limited; and Plaintiffs' 30(b)(1) Notices of Deposition of Bhaskar Reddy, Mahaboob Dowla, and Praveen Kumar filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claim Charts and Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions to Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. Nos. 1-7; (2) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claim Charts, Plaintiffs' First Set of Individual Interrogatories Nos. 1-2, and Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions to MSN Laboratories Private Limited Nos. 1-7; (3) Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Claim Charts and Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Admissions to Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. Nos. 13-19; (4) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claim Charts and Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions to RK Pharma Inc. Nos. 1-7; and (5) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claim Charts, Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions Nos. 1-7, and Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production Nos. 48-49 to Zenara Pharma Private Limited filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/28/2022. (etg)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: The Court had to adjust the Amended Schedule proposed by the parties in order to leave sufficient time to decide Daubert motions. If the parties want to agree not to file Daubert motions, then the Court is willing to expand the Expert Discovery period. (etg)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Amend Scheduling Order re #47 Scheduling Order,, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notices of 30(b)(1) Depositions and Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of MSN Laboratories Private Limited filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to RK Pharma (No. 2) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notices of Deposition filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Initial Disclosures filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma Inc.'s Supplemental 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory B. Williams - Markman Hearing held on 12/1/2022. (Court Reporter M. Rolfe.) (ntl)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan - filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan filed by RK Pharma, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/28/2022. (etg)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition of RK Pharma filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition on Prinston, Notice of Deposition of Hongchun Qiu and Notice of Deposition of Lijie Wang filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #197 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to November 30, 2022 filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/15/22. (ntl)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 8) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Myer, R.)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RK Pharma's Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Supplemental STATEMENT re 184 Oral Order,,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Supplemental STATEMENT re 184 Oral Order,,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,,, Set Hearings,,,,,, Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Statement by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to November 30, 2022 - filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 1) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Myer, R.)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RK Pharma's Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #187 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to November 14, 2022 filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited, #188 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN to substantially complete document production to November 14, 2022 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/1/22. (ntl)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Third Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 9) and Defendant Prinstons Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admission to Prinston (Nos. 1-12) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 8) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Response to Plaintiffs Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) and Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Supplemental Objections and Response to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Myer, R.)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RK Pharma's response to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN Supplemental Response and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) and Response and Objections to Plaintiffs Third Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN to substantially complete document production to November 14, 2022 - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to November 14, 2022 - filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #185 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to October 31, 2022 filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/17/22. (ntl)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Amended Initial Disclosures filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to October 31, 2022 - filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORAL ORDER: The Markman Hearing is now rescheduled for Thursday, December 1, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Upon review of the parties' claim construction materials (D.I. 120, 133, 134, 180, 181), the Court requires further information with respect to the parties' positions on how a person of ordinary skill in the art would have understood the terms (which are claimed to be indefinite) to mean at the time of the filing of the patent application. Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before Monday, November 14, 2022, plaintiff and defendants shall each provide the Court with either (a) a supplemental submission in support of the parties' respective positions as to indefiniteness or definiteness containing citations to the specification and prosecution history, or (b) inform the Court that the party will provide live witness(es) at the Markman Hearing to testify as to how a person of ordinary skill in the art would have understood the terms (which are claimed to be indefinite) to mean at the time of the filing of the patent application and where and how the claims, read in light of the specification and prosecution history, inform or fail to inform, with reasonable certainty those skilled in the art about the scope of the invention. On or before Monday, October 31, 2022, plaintiff and defendants shall inform each other as to whether a supplemental submission or live testimony will be provided to the Court. Ordered by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/07/2022. (etg)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Gregory R. Booker regarding Rescheduling Claim Construction Hearing. (Booker, Gregory)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #182 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants, Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., to Substantially Complete Document Production to October 31, 2022 filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/7/2022. (etg)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants, Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., to Substantially Complete Document Production to October 31, 2022 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Myer, R.)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Gregory R. Booker regarding Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart - re #180 Amended Document. (Booker, Gregory)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 AMENDED DOCUMENT by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. Amendment to #120 Claim Construction Chart,, Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart. (Booker, Gregory)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma Inc.'s Supplemental responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 2, 4, 5, & 6) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #174 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Limited to substantially complete document production to October 31, 2022 filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/30/22. (ntl)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 51-52) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 46-47) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests For Admission to Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Limited to substantially complete document production to October 31, 2022 - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 9) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from R Touhey Myer regarding Claim Construction Hearing - re 168 Order,,. (Myer, R.)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #170 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to October 14, 2022 filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/30/22. (ntl)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/29/22. (ntl)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited to substantially complete document production to October 14, 2022 - filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory B. Williams - Discovery Conference (in court) held on 9/29/2022. (Court Reporter M. Rolfe.) (ntl)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 46-47) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORAL ORDER: Construing Defendants Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA's September 28, 2022 letter as a request to appear at the October 12, 2022 Claim Construction Hearing without being represented by Delaware counsel, that request is DENIED. By September 30, 2022, counsel for Defendants shall file with the Court a letter either identifying Delaware counsel who will be present on behalf of Defendants, or otherwise explaining why Defendants are unable to secure any other Delaware counsel to attend. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/28/22. (ntl)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from R Touhey Myer regarding September 29, 2022 Discovery Conference. (Myer, R.)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from R Touhey Myer regarding Claim Construction Hearing. (Myer, R.)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REDACTED VERSION of #162 Letter, to Judge Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORAL ORDER: Consistent with the Court Order granting the Joint Motion for Claim Construction (D.I. 135), the Court is setting aside two (2) hours for the Markman hearing with the time split equally between the two sides. Any slide presentations the parties wish to use during the hearing shall be emailed (in PDF format) to gbw_civil@ded.uscourts.gov no later than 48 hours prior to the hearing with hard copies delivered to the Clerk's office within one hour thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 5, 2022, local and lead counsel (i.e., those attorneys that will be leading trial) for the parties shall meet and confer and file an amended joint claim construction chart that sets forth the terms that remain in dispute. The meet and confer shall focus on an attempt to reach agreement on any remaining disputed terms where possible and on an attempt to focus the dispute over the remaining terms in light of the joint claim construction brief. Accompanying any amended joint claim construction chart, the parties shall file a letter with the Court identifying by name each individual who participated in the meet and confer, when and how that meet and confer occurred and how long it lasted. If no agreements on constructions have been reached or if no dispute has been narrowed during the meet and confer, the letter shall so state. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/22/22. (ntl)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Richard C. Weinblatt regarding Discovery Dispute - re #162 Letter,. (Weinblatt, Richard)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Gregory B. Williams from Gregory R. Booker regarding Discovery Dispute Regarding Motion to Compel Discovery - re 160 Order, Set Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Booker, Gregory)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing set for 10/12/2022 will begin at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/16/22. (ntl)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Discovery Conference scheduled for 9/29/2022 at 2:00 PM will take place in Courtroom 6B before Judge Gregory B. Williams. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/16/22. (ntl)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORAL ORDER: Counsel for the parties are HEREBY ORDERED to coordinate and deliver to Chambers by 1:00 pm on Monday, September 19 two (2) paper courtesy copies of D.I. 133 and D.I. 134 with all exhibits attached. All courtesy copies should include hard tabs before exhibits for easy reference. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/16/22. (ntl)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of ROGs (Nos. 1-7) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory B Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (apk)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Myer, R.)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy H. Kratz - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Myer, R.)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #154 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy H. Kratz, filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., and #155 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan, filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/1/2022. (nms)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Hogan and Timothy H. Kratz for Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests For Production to MSN Laboratories Private Limited (Nos. 46-47); Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production to Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Nos. 51-52); and Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production to Zenara Pharma Private Limited (Nos. 46-47) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Supplemental Objection and Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 1-7) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Touhey Myer on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. (Myer, R.)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-7) and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORAL ORDER: The Markman Hearing is now rescheduled for 10/12/2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2022. (nms)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 9/29/2022, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/19/2022. (nms)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Charles Weinblatt on behalf of Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Weinblatt, Richard)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Mosley Delcollo on behalf of Zenara Pharma Private Limited (Delcollo, Renee)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2022, is CANCELED. The hearing will be rescheduled for a date to be determined. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/17/2022. (nms)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua Rosefelt - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #143 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua Rosefelt, filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/17/2022. (nms)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME deadline for completion of document production to September 30, 2022 - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #142 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order deadline for completion of document production to September 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2022. (nms)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Supplemental Objection and Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 1-7) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN's Supplemental Responses & Objections to Interrogatories filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 3, 4, 6-10) and Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 2) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's First Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 1 of Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RK Pharma's First Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplementation of Aurobindo's Responses & Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 1) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting #132 Joint Motion For Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/27/2022. (nms)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Joint Appendix re #133 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X, #2 Exhibit Y, #3 Exhibit Z, #4 Exhibit AA, #5 Exhibit BB, #6 Exhibit CC, #7 Exhibit DD, #8 Exhibit EE, #9 Exhibit FF, #10 Exhibit GG, #11 Exhibit HH, #12 Exhibit II, #13 Exhibit JJ, #14 Exhibit KK, #15 Exhibit LL, #16 Exhibit MM, #17 Exhibit NN, #18 Exhibit OO, #19 Exhibit PP, #20 Exhibit QQ, #21 Exhibit RR, #22 Exhibit SS)(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 7/26/2022 (nms).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 JOINT Claim Construction Brief, filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 7/26/2022 (nms).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Joint Motion For Claim Construction - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 7/26/2022 (nms).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' 2nd Set of Common Requests For Production (Nos. 73-76); Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-13); and Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-12) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Booker, Gregory)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 8) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Objection and Response to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Limiteds Response and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to second set of common interrogatories (No. 8) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenera Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Response to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (No. 8) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carl Douglas Neff (Neff, Carl)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendants' Second Set of Common Requests for Production to Plaintiffs, 2. Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs, 3. Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., RK Pharma, Inc., Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (No. 8) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brent A. Batzer for Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claim Charts to Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma, Inc.'s First Supplemental Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lina Genovesi for Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Joint Claim Construction Chart, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 5/16/2022 (nms).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Nitika Gupta Fiorella, regarding claim construction. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 5/13/2022 (nms).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lina Genovesi - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lina Genovesi, filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2022. (nms)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Zenara Pharma Private Limited (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Identification of Claim Terms and Proposed Constructions filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Kelly M. Conlan as Counsel for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Pursuant to the Court's #Standing Order No. 2022-2, dated March 14, 2022, "[u]nless otherwise directed by the Court, Magistrate Judges will no longer engage in alternative dispute resolution of patent and securities cases." See also 28 U.S.C. 652(b). (Taylor, Daniel)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma, Inc.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions with Prior Art filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SO ORDERED Granting #111 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/1/2022. (nms)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 4/1/2022 (nms).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Aurobindo Pharma LTD., and MSN Laboratories Private Limited's Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Connolly, Arthur)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to April 1, 2022 - filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #109 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to April 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2022. (nms)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #108 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN to serve its Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/24/2022. (nms)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN to serve its Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 29, 2022 - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SO ORDERED Granting #106 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice (*Party Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/22/2022. (nms)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 3/22/2022 (nms).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Optimus Pharma Pvt. Ltd. to serve its Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 29, 2022 - filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd. (Myer, R.)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME RK Pharma to serve its Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 29, 2022 - filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #103 STIPULATION to serve its Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2022. (nms)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #102 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME RK Pharma to serve its Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2022. (nms)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Invalidity Contentions to March 29, 2022 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #101 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Invalidity Contentions to March 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/17/2022. (nms)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN to serve its Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 25, 2022 - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #100 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to serve Initial Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production to March 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/11/2022. (nms)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lindsay Eastman as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer affiliated with Upadhye Tang LLP. (Weinblatt, Richard)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants First Set of Common Requests For Production (Nos. 1-72) and Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Claim Charts filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CORRECTED NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-10), filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 2/1/2022 (nms).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-6) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Limiteds Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-72) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7 filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN to Serve its Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) to January 21, 2022 - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Optimus Pharma Pvt. Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-7) filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd.(Myer, R.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. to Serve its Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) to January 21, 2022 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #89 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant MSN to Serve its Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) to January 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2022. (nms)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #86 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Responses to First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) to January 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2022. (nms)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) RK Pharma's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos.1-45) and; (2) RK Pharma's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of RFPs (Nos. 1-45) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service filed at D.I. 84 on 1/10/2022, has been removed from the docket per the filer's request. A corrected notice will be refiled. (nms)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests to Defendant for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-50) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) to January 10, 2022 - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Optimus Pharma Pvt. Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd.(Myer, R.)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) to January 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/3/2022. (nms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #79 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) to January 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/29/2021. (nms)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) to January 12, 2022 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #78 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File a Motion Pursuant to the Protective Order to January 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/28/2021. (nms)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME To File a Motion Pursuant to the Protective Order to January 7, 2022 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 12/28/2021 (nms).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael P. Hogan for Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-7) filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SO ORDERED Granting #75 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/7/2021. (nms)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 12/7/2021 (nms).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan - filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd. (Myer, R.)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Michael P. Hogan as co-counsel.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan, filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2021. (nms)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-45) to Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Optimus Pharma Pt Ltd., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., RK Pharma Inc., and Zenara Pharma Private Limited filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Booker, Gregory)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN's Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 11/19/2021 (nms).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #70 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2021. (nms)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd.(Myer, R.)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant RK Pharma, Inc.'s Core Technical Documents filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #67 STIPULATION to Extend Time for MSN to produce its ANDA and DMF to 11/26/2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/12/2021. (nms)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for MSN to produce its ANDA and DMF to 11/26/2021 - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Address by R. Touhey Myer (Myer, R.)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Prinstons Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Patent and Plaintiffs' ESI Disclosures filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Booker, Gregory)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit MSN's Para. 3 Initial Disclosures to Nov. 1, 2021 - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Paragraph 3 Initial Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Paragraph 3 Disclosures Pursuant to the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #62 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to submit MSN's Para. 3 Initial Disclosures to Nov. 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/2021. (nms)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery by Defendant Optimus Pharma Pvt. Ltd. filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd.(Myer, R.)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #58 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2021. (nms)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order, MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Booker, Gregory) Modified on 10/21/2021 (nms).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan - filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael P. Hogan, filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/18/2021. (nms)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zenara Pharma Private Limited's Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Defendant, Optimus Pharma Pvt. Ltd. filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd.(Myer, R.)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of initial disclosures pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) filed by RK Pharma, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julia S. Kim - filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORAL ORDER: The Rule 16(b) Conference scheduled for 9/30/2021, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2021. (nms)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 5/25/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2022. Discovery due by 1/27/2023. A Status Conference is set for 10/6/2023, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 7/12/2022. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/22/2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 12/8/2023, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day Bench Trial is set to start 1/8/2024, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2021. (nms)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah E. Jack for MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (Taylor, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julia S. Kim, filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2021. (nms)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Should any party (or all parties) desire to discuss mediation and its timing, the party(ies) shall contact Judge Thynge and her Law Clerk, Daniel Taylor (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov), to request that a teleconference be scheduled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/29/2021. (Taylor, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Jack, filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., MDD US Operations, LLC, Zambon S.p.A.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2021. (nms)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Jack - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 9/28/2021 (nms).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Nitika Gupta Fiorella, regarding Dial-in and Passcode for Rule 16(b) Telephonic Scheduling Conference. (Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 9/28/2021 (nms).
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaim, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 9/14/2021 (nms).
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #38 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 9/14/2021 (nms).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Gary Ji and Gurpreet S. Walia for MSN Laboratories Private Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A..(Gupta Fiorella, Nitika) Modified on 8/31/2021 (nms).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/30/2021, at 3:30 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2021. (nms)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A. by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd.(Myer, R.)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Limited.(Connolly, Arthur)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney James E. Nealon,Steven J. Moore for Aurobindo Pharma Limited,for Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Moore and James E. Nealon, filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2021. (nms)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Moore and James E. Nealon - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gurpreet Singh Walia, M.D. - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gongjun ("Gary") Ji - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gongjun ("Gary") Ji, filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited, #35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gurpreet Singh Walia, M.D., filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/17/2021. (nms)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd answer due 8/24/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/11/2021. (nms)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Neff, Carl)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.(Neff, Carl)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to August 24, 2021 - filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd. (Myer, R.)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd. (Myer, R.)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Touhey Myer on behalf of Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd (Myer, R.)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. for Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIMS against MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A., by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 8/10/2021 (nms).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Douglas Neff on behalf of MSN Laboratories Private Limited (Neff, Carl)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to August 24, 2021 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Conlan on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. (Conlan, Kelly)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry III and Attorney Timothy H. Kratz - filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Limited answer due 8/24/2021; Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. answer due 8/24/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George J. Barry III and Attorney Timothy H. Kratz, filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by RK Pharma, Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by RK Pharma, Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff, Ph.D., Edward Pergament and Kenneth Canfield - filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Dmitry V. Shelhoff, Ph.D., #2 Certification by Edward Pergament, #3 Certification by Kenneth Canfield)(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff, Ph.D., Edward Pergament and Kenneth Canfield, filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2021. (nms)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kenneth S. Canfield for Zenara Pharma Private Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dmitry V. Shelhoff for Zenara Pharma Private Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward D. Pergament for Zenara Pharma Private Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Biophore India Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd. for Zenara Pharma Private Limited filed by Zenara Pharma Private Limited. (Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Zenara Pharma Private Limited.(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Yixin H. Tang for Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.: For MSN Laboratories Private Limited waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Booker, Gregory)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.: For Aurobindo Pharma Limited waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021; Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Booker, Gregory)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lindsay Eastman for Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (smg)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.: For Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Booker, Gregory)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shashank D. Upadhye for Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.: For RK Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Booker, Gregory)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shashank Upadhye, Yixin Tang, Brent Batzer, and Lindsay Eastman, filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/16/2021. (nms)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.: For Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Booker, Gregory)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A., Zambon S.p.A.: For Zenara Pharma Private Limited waiver sent on 6/11/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Booker, Gregory)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shashank Upadhye, Yixin Tang, Brent Batzer, and Lindsay Eastman - filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Flanagan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Flanagan, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Zambon Company S.p.A. for Zambon S.p.A. - filed by Zambon S.p.A. (kmd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed - filed by Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A. (kmd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for MDD US Operations, LLC - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC. (kmd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,076,515; US 8,278,485; US 8,283,380. (kmd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: See Attached. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/22/2024. (kmd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Limited, Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd, Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., RK Pharma, Inc., Zenara Pharma Private Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3633393.) - filed by MDD US Operations, LLC, Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A, Zambon S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order No Summons Issued. (kmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A et al v. MSN Laboratories Private Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Kelly M. Conlan
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: James E. Nealon
Represented By: Lina Genovesi
Represented By: Michael P. Hogan
Represented By: Steven J. Moore
Represented By: Timothy H. Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Eastman
Represented By: Shashank D. Upadhye
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Yixin H. Tang
Represented By: Brent A. Batzer
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Laboratories Private Limited
Represented By: Carl Douglas Neff
Represented By: Gary Ji
Represented By: Gurpreet S. Walia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenara Pharma Private Limited
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Represented By: Dmitry V. Shelhoff
Represented By: Edward D. Pergament
Represented By: Kenneth S. Canfield
Represented By: Renee Mosley Delcollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimus Pharma Pvt Ltd
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: Michael P. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Kelly M. Conlan
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Represented By: James E. Nealon
Represented By: Lina Genovesi
Represented By: Michael P. Hogan
Represented By: Steven J. Moore
Represented By: Timothy H. Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newron Pharmaceuticals S.p.A.
Represented By: Gregory Robert Booker
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Flanagan
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Bonnie Fletcher Price
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Sarah E. Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MDD US Operations, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Robert Booker
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Flanagan
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Bonnie Fletcher Price
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Sarah E. Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zambon S.p.A.
Represented By: Gregory Robert Booker
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Flanagan
Represented By: Nitika Gupta Fiorella
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Bonnie Fletcher Price
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Sarah E. Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?