Esquivel et al v. Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ines G. Esquivel as Trustee of the Ines G. Esquivel Trust
Defendant: Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Ines G Esquivel and Ines G. Esquivel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00850
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Ines G. Esquivel, Ines G. Esquivel as Trustee of the Ines G. Esquivel Trust. (Forcier, Justin) Modified on 8/9/2021 (dlw).
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying Action by Ines G. Esquivel, Ines G. Esquivel as Trustee of the Ines G. Esquivel Trust. (Forcier, Justin)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #20 Stipulation and Order Staying Case - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is STAYED for 90 days (until 11/8/2021). The parties shall file a joint status report on 11/8/2021. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/9/2021. (dlw)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before 8/19/2021, the parties shall file the requisite Local Rule 81.2 statement. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/5/2021. (dlw)
August 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Daugherty on behalf of Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc. (Daugherty, Sally)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Forcier on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Forcier, Justin)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Rostocki on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rostocki, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 7/14/2021. (myr)
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 Record of case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number in Other District: 2:20-cv-01601. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Change Venue. The Case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Plaintiffs Ines G. Esquivel, Ines G. Esquivel as Trustee of the Ines G. Esquivel Trust. (Lloyd, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM filed by Ines G. Esquivel, Ines G. Esquivel as Trustee of the Ines G. Esquivel Trust.(Lloyd, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.. (Hackett, Stephen) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Change Venue by Counter Defendant Ines G. Esquivel. Replies due by 11/30/2020. (Lloyd, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Hackett, Stephen) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ines G. Esquivel. Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc. served on 10/2/2020. (Lloyd, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hackett, Stephen) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/13/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.. filed by Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hackett, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ines G. Esquivel. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lloyd, Jennifer) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6168713) by Ines G. Esquivel. Proof of service due by 12/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lloyd, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 6/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esquivel et al v. Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ines G Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ines G. Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Country Infrastructure Services USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sally J. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ines G. Esquivel as Trustee of the Ines G. Esquivel Trust
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Represented By: Justin M. Forcier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?