Gurmessa v. Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tolessa Gurmessa
Defendant: Senait Senay, Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, Biniam Hirut Debabe, Senait Dereje Senay, Biniam Debabe, GPE Executive Committee and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 1:2021cv00869
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 30 Amended Certificate of Service for #29 Letter, by Biniam Hirut Debabe. (Gamgort, William) Modified on 8/5/2021 (nms).
August 5, 2021 Filing 29 Letter to Judge Andrews, from Defendant Biniam Hirut Debabe, regarding dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gamgort, William) Modified on 8/5/2021 (nms).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The Motion for Authorization to Register as CM/ECF User (D.I. #4 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2021. (nms)
August 4, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY to #12 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, Senait Senay. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holly, Timothy) Modified on 8/4/2021 (nms).
July 29, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 22 has been removed and recoded to reflect the filing as an Answering brief in Opposition (D.I. #26 ) and not a response. (myr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tolessa Gurmessa.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Certificate of Service)(myr) Modified on 7/29/2021 (nms).
July 28, 2021 Filing 25 Copy of Response (D.I. #26 ), filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (myr) Modified on 7/28/2021 (nms). Modified on 7/29/2021 (myr).
July 28, 2021 Filing 24 Letter to Judge Richard G. Andrews, from Tolessa Gurmessa, dated 7/20/2021, regarding opposition to Motion for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #17 ). (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Certificate of Service)(myr) Modified on 7/28/2021 (nms).
July 28, 2021 Filing 23 Supplement to #4 Motion for Authorization to Register as CM/ECF User, filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Certificate of Service)(myr) Modified on 7/28/2021 (nms).
July 21, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service for Response (D.I. #14 ), filed by Tolessa Gurmessa (myr) Modified on 7/21/2021 (nms).
July 21, 2021 Filing 20 CLERK'S ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a Motion for Authorization to Register as a CM/ECF User (D.I. #4 ). Upon review of the request it appears it does not comply with the District Courts CM/ECF Administrative Procedures regarding Registration/Training. NOW THEREFORE, Plaintiff is directed to supplement in writing whether or not he has independently reviewed all of the materials and related topics on the Courts web site, and if Plaintiff has a PACER account. The motion will be held in abeyance until such further supplementation is received. Signed by Clerk of the Court on 7/21/2021. (nms)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiff can respond by letter if Plaintiff opposes the Motion for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #17 ), and any such letter is due within one week of the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/21/2021. (nms)
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of William E. Gamgort (D.I. #15 ), Notice of Appearance of Jennifer M. Kinkus (D.I. #16 ) and Defendant Biniam Debabe's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #17 ), by Biniam Hirut Debabe. (Gamgort, William) Modified on 7/20/2021 (nms).
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss - filed by Biniam Hirut Debabe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gamgort, William) Modified on 7/20/2021 (nms).
July 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Kinkus on behalf of Biniam Hirut Debabe (Kinkus, Jennifer)
July 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Gamgort on behalf of Biniam Hirut Debabe (Gamgort, William)
July 15, 2021 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Plaintiff Tolessa Gurmessa re #14 Response to Motion. This filing does not comply with Local Rule 5.2(b)(2). Plaintiff is requested to supplement the docket accordingly. (nms)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6)(srs) Modified on 7/14/2021 (nms).
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice of Appearance (D.I. 10), Notice of Appearance (D.I. 11), and MOTION to Dismiss (D.I. 12), by Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, and Senait Senay. (DeLuca, Lauren) Modified on 7/13/2021 (nms).
July 13, 2021 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc. and Senait Senay re #12 Motion to Dismiss, #10 Notice of Appearance, and #11 Notice of Appearance. These filings do not comply with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Defendants Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc., and Senait Senay are requested to supplement the docket accordingly. (nms)
July 13, 2021 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/27/2021. (nms)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, Senait Senay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holly, Timothy) Modified on 7/13/2021 (nms).
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Patrice DeLuca on behalf of Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, Senait Senay (DeLuca, Lauren)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Holly on behalf of Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, Senait Senay (Holly, Timothy)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #8 ) will be held in abeyance until it is properly served on the Plaintiff. If Defendant Debabe does not serve the motion by August 11, 2021, the motion will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2021. (nms)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Biniam Hirut Debabe. (smg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons served on Senait Senay on 6/19/2021, filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (kmd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons served on Biniam Hirut Debabe on 6/21/2021, filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (kmd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons served on Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, LegalCorp Solutions, LLC, on 6/24/2021, filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (kmd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Authorization to Register as CM/ECF User, filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (kmd)
June 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 21, 2021 Remark: Filing Fee $402.00 Paid. Receipt Number DEX035812. Copy of Rule 4 and AO85A forms mailed to Plaintiff (apk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Biniam Hirut Debabe, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc, Senait Senay (Filing fee $ 402.) - filed by Tolessa Gurmessa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit Praecipe, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurmessa v. Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senait Senay
Represented By: Lauren Patrice DeLuca
Represented By: Timothy Michael Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genocide Prevention in Ethiopa Inc
Represented By: Lauren Patrice DeLuca
Represented By: Timothy Michael Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biniam Hirut Debabe
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Represented By: William Edward Gamgort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senait Dereje Senay
Represented By: Lauren Patrice DeLuca
Represented By: Timothy Michael Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biniam Debabe
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Represented By: William Edward Gamgort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPE Executive Committee
Represented By: Lauren Patrice DeLuca
Represented By: Timothy Michael Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tolessa Gurmessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?