Black et al v. Michel et al
Plaintiff: Shieta Black and City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust
Defendant: Gary S. Michel, William F. Banholzer, Kirk S. Hachigian, L. Brooks Mallard, Anthony Munk, Mark A. Beck, Roderick C. Wendt, Onex Corporation, Patrick Tolbert, Suzanne L. Stefany, Matthew D. Ross, Bruce M. Taten, Gregory G. Maxwell, Martha S. Byorum and Steven E. Wynne
Nominal Defendant: Jeld-Wen Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00881
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 11 in 21-cv-881-RGA; D.I. 13 in 21-cv-135-RGA) Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order consolidating cases (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/16/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00135-RGA, 1:21-cv-00881-RGA(nms)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order, by Shieta Black, City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Varallo, Gregory) Modified on 7/16/2021 (nms).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER: The Court requires that there only be one lead counsel. Thus, as presented, the joint stipulation (D.I. 8 in 21-cv-881-RGA; D.I. 10 in 21-cv-135-RGA) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00135-RGA, 1:21-cv-00881-RGA(nms)
July 13, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to Clerk of Court, from Gregory V. Varallo, Esq., regarding related case. (Varallo, Gregory) Modified on 7/14/2021 (nms).
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation, by Shieta Black, City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Varallo, Gregory) Modified on 7/14/2021 (nms).
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by Shieta Black, City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Varallo, Gregory) Modified on 7/14/2021 (nms).
June 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shieta Black, City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. William F. Banholzer served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Mark A. Beck served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Martha S. Byorum served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Kirk S. Hachigian served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; L. Brooks Mallard served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Gregory G. Maxwell served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Gary S. Michel served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Anthony Munk served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Matthew D. Ross served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Suzanne L. Stefany served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Bruce M. Taten served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Patrick Tolbert served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Roderick C. Wendt served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Steven E. Wynne served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Varallo, Gregory)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shieta Black, City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. Jeld-Wen Holdings, Inc. served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Varallo, Gregory)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 06/22/2021. (apk)
June 22, 2021 Remark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (apk)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 [SEALED] COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against William F. Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha S. Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, Jeld-Wen Holdings, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory G. Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Onex Corporation, Matthew D. Ross, Suzanne L. Stefany, Bruce M. Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick C. Wendt, Steven E. Wynne - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3639708.) - filed by Shieta Black, City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2021: #3 Shieta Black Verification) (apk).
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Shieta Black, City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(apk)
June 21, 2021 Remark: Exit Electronic Copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (apk)
June 21, 2021 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black et al v. Michel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Banholzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk S. Hachigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Brooks Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Munk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick C. Wendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne L. Stefany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce M. Taten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory G. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha S. Byorum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shieta Black
Represented By: Gregory V. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Miami General Employees' & Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust
Represented By: Gregory V. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Jeld-Wen Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?