EVANS v. DELAWARE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: Hayward M. Evans
Defendant: Delaware Department of Justice, Delaware Department of State Police and Delaware Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2021cv00903
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 Authorization by Hayward M. Evans requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (srs).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $35.25 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form)( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/9/2021.) Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 07/09/2021. (Attachments: #1 Authorization) (smg)
June 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00903-LPS, 1:21-cv-00925-LPS (rjb)
June 28, 2021 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2241, filed in C.A. 21-925, per #4 Order. (kmd)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 Record of case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number in Other District: 1:21-cv-01147. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 24, 2021 Remark: Copy of Docket Sheet Mailed to Petitioner. (apk)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of Delaware. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 05/28/2021. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/24/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by HAYWARD M. EVANS (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/24/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HAYWARD M. EVANS. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/24/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delaware Department of Corrections, Delaware Department of Justice, Delaware Department of State Police with Jury Demand filed by Hayward M. Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(zsb)[Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/24/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/26/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS v. DELAWARE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Department of State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayward M. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?