Johnson v. Wofford et al
Plaintiff: Marcus J. Johnson
Defendant: Centurion and Matthew Wofford
Case Number: 1:2021cv00905
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Judge Richard G. Andrews, from Marcus J. Johnson, dated 7/30/2021, regarding inability to provide trust fund account statement as housing facility does not provide them . (myr) Modified on 8/3/2021 (nms).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice (Copy to pltf.) (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/19/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2021. (nms)
July 20, 2021 Remark: Plaintiff's address was typed in incorrectly during case opening. After reviewing documents, Plaintiff's address was corrected from 28 Todd Lane to 38 Todd Lane. Case Assigned notice and D.I. #4 were remailed to the corrected address. (mal) Modified on 7/20/2021 (nms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Marcus J. Johnson. (mal)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/7/2021. (nms)
June 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against All Defendants - filed by Marcus J Johnson.(srs)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Marcus J Johnson. (srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wofford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?