Neale v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Neale, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00915
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David F. Chermol for Ronald Wayne Neale, Jr added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Chermol, Esq. filed by Ronald Wayne Neale, Jr. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/1/2021. (dlw)
June 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Chermol, Esq. - filed by Ronald Wayne Neale, Jr. (srs)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew M. Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3644844.) - filed by Ronald Wayne Neale, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)
June 28, 2021 No Summons Issued. (srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neale v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Neale, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen A. Hampton
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?