McGriff v. Delaware Department of Correction et al
Plaintiff: Joshua D. McGriff
Defendant: Delaware Department of Correction, Howard R. Young Correctional Institution and C/O Bucknor
Case Number: 1:2021cv00996
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Joshua D. McGriff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(myr)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Authorization by Joshua D. McGriff requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization to Prison Business Office) (mal)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER, Plaintiff has improperly joined several claims which rest upon different factual bases. This Court must sever the claims so the litigation can proceed in a logical fashion. 1. The first case, C.A. No. 21-021-MN contains the following parties: Plaintiff, Joshua D. McGriff; Defendants, Mary Quinn, Lawrence Matic, Officer DeBarnaventure, the City of Wilmington, and the Wilmington Police Department. 2. Delaware Department of Correction, Howard R. Young Correctional Institution, and C/O Bucknor are DISMISSED from the first case. 3. Paragraphs 17-22 and 24 of the Amended Complaint are STRICKEN from the first case. 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to OPEN a new case, referred to as the second case (C.A. No. 21-996). The parties in the second case are Plaintiff, Joshua D. McGriff; Defendants Delaware Department of Correction, Howard R. Young Correctional Institution, and C/O Bucknor. The Amended Complaint (D.I. 11 in the first case C.A. No. 21-021-MN) shall be docketed as the Complaint in the newly opened second case. 5. Paragraphs 1-16 and 23 of the Complaint in the second case are STRICKEN. 6. Mary Quinn, Lawrence Matic, Officer DeBarnaventure, the City of Wilmington,and the Wilmington Police Department shall not be docketed as Defendants in the second case. 7. A copy of the January 14, 2021 Order granting Plaintiff in forma pauperis (D.I. 5) status in the first case shall be filed in the newly opened second case. Within thirty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall complete, sign and return to the Clerk of Court, the attached authorization form allowing the agency having custody of him to forward the $1.00 initial partial filing fee and subsequent payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 07/07/2021. (smg)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $1.00 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/6/2021. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 01/14/2021. (smg)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against C/O Bucknor, Delaware Department of Correction, Howard R. Young Correctional Institution (IFP)- filed by Joshua D. McGriff.(smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGriff v. Delaware Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua D. McGriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard R. Young Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Bucknor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?