Avas Sales Lead Services, Inc. v. John or Jane Doe
Plaintiff: Avas Sales Lead Services, Inc. doing business as Avas Flowers
Defendant: John or Jane Done
Case Number: 1:2021cv01005
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct // Plaintiff's Amended Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Subpoena Facebook, Inc. and Related Third Parties with Declaration - filed by Avas Sales Lead Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warner, Raeann) Modified on 9/1/2021 (dlw).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoena on Facebook, Inc. and Related Third Parties - Plaintiff's request to conduct third-party discovery prior to a Rule 26(f) conference is DENIED without prejudice to renew at a later stage. Courts in this district have applied the "good cause" standard in cases "where expedited discovery is sought in order to identify unknown or anonymous John Does." Reybold Grp. of Companies, Inc. v. Does 1-20, 323 F.R.D. 205, 208 (D. Del. 2017); see also Vision Films, Inc. v. John Does 1-24, No. 12-1746-LPS-SRF, 2013 WL 1163988, at *3 (D. Del. Mar. 20, 2013). To determine whether good cause exists, one relevant factor is whether Plaintiff "has no other way to identify the alleged wrongdoers, aside from obtaining the discovery at issue." Reybold, 323 F.R.D. at 208. Plaintiff asserts that it has reached out to Doe via Facebook without response (D.I. 1 paragraph 30), but the Court is not convinced that Plaintiff has exhausted other means of identifying the individual (or information that could assist in identifying the individual). See, e.g., Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe, No. 18-895-LPS, 2018 WL 5024168 (D. Del. Oct. 17, 2018) (plaintiff hired private investigators to determine IP addresses of alleged copyright infringers). After attempting additional efforts to identify Doe, if Plaintiff remains unsuccessful, Plaintiff may refile its motion with a recitation of the additional efforts and a showing of why Plaintiff has "no other way" to identify Doe without the requested subpoena. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/19/2021. (dlw)
August 11, 2021 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document at D.I. 3 has been replaced. The citations now appear in line and not in footnotes, pursuant to Judge Noreika's Preferences and Procedures. In addition, Exhibit 1-5 to the declaration have been added as an attachment to the filing. (dlw)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoena on Facebook, Inc. and Related Third Parties - filed by Avas Sales Lead Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warner, Raeann) Modified on 8/9/2021 (dlw). (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/11/2021) (dlw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2021: #3 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration) (dlw).
July 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against John or Jane Done - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3653810.) - filed by Avas Sales Lead Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)
July 9, 2021 No Summons Issued. (mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avas Sales Lead Services, Inc. v. John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avas Sales Lead Services, Inc. doing business as Avas Flowers
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Done
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?