Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al v. Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.
Defendant: Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. and Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01107
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Coyle, Nicholas A. Geiger, and Katherine M. Tassmer - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven M. Coyle, Nicholas A. Geiger, and Katherine M. Tassmer filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/21. (ntl)
September 24, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicholas A. Geiger,Katherine M. Tassmer,Steven M. Coyle for Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
September 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jane M. Love for Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS(srs)
September 17, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Kyanna Sabanoglu, Anne Y. Brody, Ronald A. Lee, Sung Bin Lee for Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS(srs)
September 16, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Other Affiliate Teva Holdco US, Inc for Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
September 16, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against All Plaintiffs by Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (14 in 1:21-cv-01107-LPS, 11 in 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 12 in 1:21-cv-01106-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS (ntl)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee - filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Jane M. Love, Kyanna Sabanoglu, Sung Bin Lee, Anne Y. Brody, and Ronald A. Lee)(Silver, Daniel)
August 25, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory C. Bays for Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Lowe, Steven H. Sklar, Gregory C. Bays, James W. Sanner, and Keelin D. Bielski of Leydig, Voit & Mayer, Ltd. filed by Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/23/21. (ntl)
August 23, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James W. Sanner,Jeremy Lowe for Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
August 23, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Keelin D. Bielski for Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Lowe, Steven H. Sklar, Gregory C. Bays, James W. Sanner, and Keelin D. Bielski of Leydig, Voit & Mayer, Ltd. - filed by Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alvogen Emerging Markets Holding Limited, Corporate Parent Alvogen Lux Holdings S..r.l., Corporate Parent Innobic (Asia) Company Limited, Corporate Parent PTT Public Company Limited, Corporate Parent The Ministry of Finance of Thailand for Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses By Defendant Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. by Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd..(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 20, 2021 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/9/21. (ntl)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to September 20, 2021 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
August 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01105-LPS, 1:21-cv-01106-LPS, 1:21-cv-01107-LPS (rjb)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc. served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Joyce, Alexandra)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc. on 7/30/2021. (srs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 7/30/2021. (srs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.. (srs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (srs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,973,031 ;8,222,244 ;8,575,146. (srs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: June 14, 2021. Date of Expiration of Patents: July 13, 2025, October 29 2022, and December 2, 2030.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 12/14/2023. (srs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., and Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3668345.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation and Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al v. Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Anne Y. Brody
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Kyanna Sabanoglu
Represented By: Ronald A. Lee
Represented By: Sung Bin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Anne Y. Brody
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Kyanna Sabanoglu
Represented By: Ronald A. Lee
Represented By: Sung Bin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotus Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Gregory C. Bays
Represented By: James W. Sanner
Represented By: Jeremy Lowe
Represented By: Keelin D. Bielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Development, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Katherine M. Tassmer
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: Nicholas A. Geiger
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?